The Burlington Insurance Company v. Alan et al
Plaintiff: The Burlington Insurance Company
Defendant: Terrance Alan, DHS Global Investments LLC, Club Paree LLC, Delashon Monique Green, Sariyah Fulbright, Te'janaey Scott and Ana'Staja Fulbright
Case Number: 3:2012cv03372
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/28/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST by Terrance Alan, Scottsdale Insurance Company Request to Participate by Telephone in Hearing on Entry of Default and Final Judgment. Counsel is directed to provide the clerk with a direct dial phone number, the court initiates all conference calls.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/19/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting request to appear by phone at default judgment hearing. Counsel is directed to provide the clerk with a direct dial phone number. The Court initiates all conference calls.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 33 65 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING; RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING 42 45 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY 26 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/13 is continued to 2/22/2013 02:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/16/13., Motions terminated: 29 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Terrance Alan. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Motions terminated: 20 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by The Burlington Insurance Company. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/12 is continued to 2/8/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Burlington Insurance Company v. Alan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Burlington Insurance Company
Represented By: William Campbell Morison
Represented By: Thomas Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Alan
Represented By: Joel Andrew Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS Global Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Paree LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delashon Monique Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sariyah Fulbright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Te'janaey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana'Staja Fulbright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?