Be In, Inc. v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Be In, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc. and Richard Robinson
Case Number: 3:2012cv03373
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PLAINTIFF BE IN, INC.S RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Be In, Inc. (Russ, Larry) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 90 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. Filed by Be In, Inc.. (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 11/15/2013) Modified text on 11/18/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Craig Russ (Russ, Larry) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorian Seawind Berger (Berger, Dorian) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 9, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Larry Craig Russ and Dorian Seawind Berger (Russ, Larry) (Filed on 11/9/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 85 Statement of Non-Opposition re 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend COMPLAINT Defendants' Conditional Non-Opposition filed byGOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Related document(s) 84 ) (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend COMPLAINT filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Charles S. Barquist, # 2 Proposed Order)(Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 83 Declaration of Joseph DAnna in Support of 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement #2 and Exhibit B Thereto filed byBe In, Inc.. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC Regarding 81 Declaration and Unredacted Exhibits A and B to Declaration In Support of Motion to Seal (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/11/2013) Modified on 10/15/2013 linking entry to document #81 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 Filing 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement #2 and Exhibit B Thereto filed by GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Riana S. Pfefferkorn in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Joint Statement (Exh. A to Declaration))(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Lucy Koh granting 64 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 79 CLERKS NOTICE Case management conference set for 10/10/2013 is VACATED. The hearing on the motion to dismiss set for 10/10/2013 is hereby VACATED. A Case Management Conference is set for 1/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall file a joint case management statement by January 22, 2014. ***THIS IS A TEXT ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.*** (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 3, 2013 Filing 78 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-14-13, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2013. (Related documents(s) 71 ) (las, ) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 76 Joint Discovery Letter BriefBriefDiscovery Dispute Joint Report Report #1 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 75 filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 75 Discovery Dispute Joint Report # 1 filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Protective Order)(Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified text on 9/12/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 Filing 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Standard Litigation filed by GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 73 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING DATE FOR MOTIO HEARING AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY NOTICE. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS DOCKET ENRTRY***** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Be In, Inc. for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 69 REPLY (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss First, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action of The Second Amended Complaint ) filed byGOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Colleen Bal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 14, 2013 Filing 70 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2013 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/14/2013), Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 1/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 68 NOTICE by Be In, Inc. - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY CECILIA ZINITI - (Ziniti, Cecilia) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 67 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by Be In, Inc.. (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/10/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 65 OPPOSITION to ( 64 MOTION to Dismiss First, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action of The Second Amended Complaint ) filed by Be In, Inc.. (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 8/1/2013) Modified text on 8/4/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2013 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss First, Third, and Fourth Causes of Action of The Second Amended Complaint filed by GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 7/25/2013. Replies due by 8/1/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Colleen Bal ISO Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 7/11/2013) Modified text on 7/12/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 Filing 63 EXHIBITS re 59 Amended Complaint Ex. A - Certificate of Registration filed byBe In, Inc.. (Related document(s) 59 ) (Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE UK LTD. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified text on 6/19/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by YouTube, LLC (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified text on 6/19/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2013 Filing 60 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GOOGLE UK LTD., Google Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 59 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., YouTube, LLC, GOOGLE UK LTD.. Filed byBe In, Inc.. (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 6/10/2013) Modified text on 6/11/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2013 Filing 58 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 57 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ALLOWING BE IN, INC. TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PROVIDING NAMED DEFENDANTS WITH AN EXTENSION TO RESPOND THERETO filed by Be In, Inc., Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Barquist (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Joy Ray (Ray, Wendy) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Roman A Swoopes (Swoopes, Roman) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecilia Ziniti (Ziniti, Cecilia) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Alexander Kuwayti (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/04/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 51 Order Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 50 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 49 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. or Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - INITIAL JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER - filed by Be In, Inc., Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 47 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 46 Stipulation Extending Time to File Reply Brief.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF BE IN, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - filed by Be In, Inc., Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Kuwayti, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 45 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 44 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 14, 2013 Filing 43 CONDITIONAL OPPOSITION to ( 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed by Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Colleen Bal ISO Conditional Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Bal Declaration)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 5/14/2013) Modified text on 5/16/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Charles S. Barquist ; [PROPOSED] ORDER (Barquist, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 41 Notice of Re-Filing of Exhibits to Declaration of Katie Townsend in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint in Color by Be In, Inc. re 39 Exhibits (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified text on 5/2/2013 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2013 Filing 40 Proposed Order re 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Be In, Inc.. (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 39 EXHIBITS re 38 Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byBe In, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 38 Declaration of Katie Townsend in Support of 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byBe In, Inc.. (Related document(s) 37 ) (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Be In, Inc.. (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by Be In, Inc. (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 34 Motion to Continue; finding as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 26, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 35 Order on Motion to Continue, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 25, 2013 Filing 34 MOTION to Continue Hearing on 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order with Stipulation, Granting Unopposed Administrative Motion of Be In to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action and Initial Case Management Conference)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 3/25/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 linking entry to document #15 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2013 Filing 33 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Edward Addiego, III terminated. Substitution of counsel approved.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING BE IN, INC. TO FILE A NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/06/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Ashlie Beringer NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF BE IN, INC. (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by S. Ashlie Beringer NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; [PROPOSED] ORDER (Beringer, S.) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 5, 2013 Filing 29 Statement of Non-Opposition re 28 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, attached Declarations of Joseph E. Addiego III and William E. Wallace III, supporting same filed byGoogle Inc., Richard Robinson. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 19, 2013 Filing 28 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff, attached Declarations of Joseph E. Addiego III and William E. Wallace III, supporting same filed by Be In, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 3/5/2013. Replies due by 3/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
December 17, 2012 Pursuant to 27 Order, Reset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 , Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 26 Stipulation (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 13, 2012 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Be In's Third and Fourth Causes of Action and Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Be In, Inc.. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
October 2, 2012 Filing 25 REPLY (re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 ) Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Google's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action filed byGoogle Inc., Richard Robinson. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Ha-Thanh Nguyen in Support of 23 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 [Public Redated Version Pursuant to Judge Koh's 12/21/2011 Standing Order] (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 Filing 23 OPPOSITION to ( 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 ); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Be In, Inc.. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2012 Filing 22 Stipulated Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Be In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Roni E. Bergoffen, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 9/25/2012) Modified text on 9/26/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2012 Filing 21 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 12, 2012 Filing 20 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 16 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 12, 2012 Filing 19 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order for Extension of Time for Be In, Inc. to File Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss Third and Fourth Causes of Action of First Amended Complaint filed by Be In, Inc.. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 9/12/2012) Modified text on 9/13/2012 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DATE OF MOTION HEARING Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *****THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY**** (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document # 14 filed by Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 16 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 14 filed by Google Inc., Richard Robinson. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2013 01:13 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/18/2012. Replies due by 9/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 14 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. REFER TO 15 *** MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third and Fourth Causes of Action filed by Google Inc., Richard Robinson. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/18/2012. Replies due by 9/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/5/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2012 Filing 13 Defendant Richard Robinson's ANSWER to Complaint byGoogle Inc., Richard Robinson. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 16, 2012 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Google Inc., Richard Robinson. Filed byBe In, Inc.. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/23/12. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 1 Complaint, 2 ADR Scheduling Order by Be In, Inc. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 7/19/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 linking entry to document #1 and 2 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2012 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc., Richard Robinson.. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 5 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Google Inc., Richard Robinson. (Graves, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 6, 2012 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Be In, Inc.. Google Inc. served on 7/5/2012, answer due 7/26/2012. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Be In, Inc. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/26/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google Inc., Richard Robinson ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611075768.). Filed byBe In, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Be In, Inc. v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Be In, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Charles Tait Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Robinson
Represented By: Charles Tait Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?