United States Of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 2106 Ringwood Avenue, San Jose, California
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements Located at 2106 Ringwood Avenue, San Jose, California
Claimant: Concourse Business Center, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv03566
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/3/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re (80 in 3:12-cv-03566-MEJ) Notice (Other) filed by Concourse Business Center, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting (100) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-03567-MEJ; granting (76) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-03566-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting (95) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-03567-MEJ; granting (71) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-03566-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying (64) Landlord's Motion for Order Prohibiting Unlawful Use of Defendant Property in case 3:12-cv-03567-MEJ; denying (13) Landlord's Motion for Order Prohibiting Unlawful Use of Defendant Property in case 3:12-cv-03566-MEJ; denying (16) Motion to Stay Landlords' Motions in case 3:12-cv-05245-MEJ (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James in case 3:12-cv-03567-MEJ; granting (34) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-05245-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PRELIMINARY QUESTIONS FOR DECEMBER 20, 2012 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER VACATING CMC.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/18/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting (43) Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Motion For Preliminary Injunction in case 3:12-cv-03566-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONTINUING CMC IN 12-3566 AND 12-3567 - Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/29/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James in case 3:12-cv-03567-MEJ; granting (24) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-03566-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting (42) Stipulation to continue Case Management Conference in case 3:12-cv-03567-MEJ (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 2106 Ringwood Avenue, San Jose, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Arvon Jacque Perteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements Located at 2106 Ringwood Avenue, San Jose, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Concourse Business Center, LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Avilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?