Fujifilm Corporation v. Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fujifilm Corporation
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola Mobility LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv03587
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS MATTER OF LAW OR FOR A NEW TRIAL, AND ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick re: 361 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 362 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 362 Motion for New Trial, and 363 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 STIPULATION AND ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to 361 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and New Trial; 362 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, Alternatively, for a New Trial as to Liability and a New Trial as to Unassessed Willfulness and Damages; and 363 Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment to Award Prejudgment Interest. Responses due by 10/8/2015. Replies due by 10/29/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER ON INEQUITABLE CONDUCT AND LACHES re 348 Response, 349 Errata, and 343 Status Report. Motorola's inequitable conduct and laches defenses are both deficient, and its request for an evidentiary hearing to present additional facts regarding laches is DENIED. Judgment may now be entered in this case. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES TO REBUT PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTE EXPERT REPORT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/07/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER REGARDING 343 JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 TENTATIVE ORDER REGARDING FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge William Orrick on 04/28/2015. (Hard copy provided to parties in open court 4/28/2015.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF KEITH PARDY AND DR. GARETH MACARTNEY; PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S OUTSTANDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE re: 202 MOTION to Suppress, 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/08/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge William H. Orrick re: 211 and 225 Motions in Limine. On March 11, 2015, the parties advised the Court that they had resolved a number of their motions in limine. The parties shall file the stipulation memorializing their agreement on these motions in limine on or before March 25, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 155 Admin istrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (NOTE: T his document has been redacted of confidential information; an unredacted image will be posted separately and its access restricted to court personnel. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/20/2015 to revise language regarding restrictions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLACEMENT EXPERT WITNESS REPORT re 169 Statement filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/05/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO DESIGNATE REPLACEMENT EXPERT WITNESS re 145 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO COMPLETE LIMITED FACT DISCOVERY re 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Discovery cutoff extended to 8/22/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/11/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 130 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Ongoing Review of Source Code And Extending Deadline For The Parties to Complete Limited Fact Discovery>. Discovery cutoff extended to 8/8/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/15/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re 123 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaim. The motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco (advanced from 4/6/201). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE HEARING ON DISCOVERY ISSUES re 103 and 105 MOTION for Protective Order. Telephone Conference set for 4/21/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Courtroom deputy, Ms. Jean Davis, will make arrangements with counsel. Counsel are admonished to read my Standing Order before the hearing. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 88 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Motorola shall file its invalidity contentions within three days from the date of this Order. Within 20 days, Fujifilm may also file a three-page letter brief explaining whether and why supplemental claim construction for the 119 Patent's term "menu" is necessary. Motorola may file a three-page response within seven days thereafter. The Court will then decide whether supplemental claim construction is necessary. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 73 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/26/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. The Court will hold a Case Management Conference on 12/17/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco, at which the parties should be prepared to discuss case scheduling and other matters that may require the Court's attention. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTS FOR PLAINTIFF'S PATENT L.R. 3-1 DISCLOSURES re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/09/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 32 TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO SUBMIT A STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND THE FORMAT OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 26 TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO SUBMIT A STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Markman hearing set for 9/25/2013 10:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 9/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/17/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/12/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fujifilm Corporation v. Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fujifilm Corporation
Represented By: Corey Ray Houmand
Represented By: Ahren Christian Hsu-Hoffman
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael John Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?