Duarte et al v. Mayorkas et al
Petitioner: Jose Duarte and Yolanda Asparren
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas and United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2012cv03647
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/16/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CLARIFYING AND AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER Re: Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/17/2012. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause filed by Jose Duarte, Yolanda Asparren. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/16/2012. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yolanda Asparren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?