Gradillas et al v. Lincoln General Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Gradillas, Chris Gradillas and Assignees of Kenneth Nwadiki Jr
Defendant: Lincoln General Insurance Company, Pro Insurance Solution Limited, Pro IS Inc, Walshire Assurance Company, Kingsway Financial Services Inc, Tawa PLC, LGIC Holdings and Kingsway America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03697
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re 147 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Who Have Not Yet Appeared in the Action filed by Lillian Gradillas. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (60 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/8/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF THE JUDGMENT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 62 filed by Kingsway Financial Services, Inc., Walshire Assurance Company, Pro IS Inc, Kingsway America, Inc., Lincoln General Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/5/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/22/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/13/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 87 Stipulation. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 79 Motion to Shorten Time. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 57 Motion for Sanctions. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting re 70 Stipulation, filed by Lillian Gradillas, Reset Deadlines as to 57 Joint MOTION for Sanctions Responses due by 11/21/2012. Replies due by 11/30/2012.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/13/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR THE RESCHEDULING OF THE MOTION HEARING AND CMC TO NOVEMBER 16, 2012. Reset Hearing as to 41 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant Lincoln General In surance Company, Motion Hearing reset for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Case Management Conference reset for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/29/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND VACATING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/24/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gradillas et al v. Lincoln General Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Gradillas
Represented By: Scott A. Brown
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Gradillas
Represented By: Scott A. Brown
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assignees of Kenneth Nwadiki Jr
Represented By: Scott A. Brown
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln General Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Brentley P. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Insurance Solution Limited
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: Brentley P. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro IS Inc
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: Brentley P. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walshire Assurance Company
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Brentley P. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsway Financial Services Inc
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Brentley P. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tawa PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGIC Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsway America, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: George D. Yaron
Represented By: Brentley P. Yim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?