Lopez v. Contra Costa Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez
Defendant: Contra Costa Regional Medical Center and County of Contra Costa
Case Number: 3:2012cv03726
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting 94 Ex Parte Application to Approve Settlement of Minor Plaintiffs' Claims. The court directs the parties to file, by March 6, 2015, either: (1) a stipulated dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a); or (2) a joint status update explaining why a stipulated dismissal has not yet been filed. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO CONDUCT MEDIATION WITHOUT LEAD DEFENSE COUNSEL (Counsel to ensure that appropriate defense representatives are present): Re: 78 Letter Brief filed by Jesus Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/15/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 73 Motion for Summary Judgment.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED ORDER (with signature line) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Last Day for Dispositive Motion Hearing 5/1/2014 at 9:30 a.m. and/or Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/18/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 42 Letter Brief filed by Jesus Lopez (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER to file joint statement of undisputed material facts. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/21/2013. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 16 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 8 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Contra Costa Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez
Represented By: Geoffrey Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Regional Medical Center
Represented By: W. David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: W. David Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?