Virtusio v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority Long Term Disability Income Plan et al
Plaintiff: Nelia Virtusio
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada and Financial Industry Regulatory Authority Long Term Disability Income Plan
Case Number: 3:2012cv03745
Filed: July 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/27/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/1/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virtusio v. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority Long Term Disability Income Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority Long Term Disability Income Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelia Virtusio
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Represented By: Karen Kay Wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?