Kucharczyk v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Douglas Kucharczyk
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03760
Filed: July 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/15/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whitee on 8/9/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kucharczyk v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Kucharczyk
Represented By: Mark E. Burton, Jr.
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuitive Surgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?