Vasquez v. Gamez et al
Plaintiff: Eneas Vasquez
Defendant: Juan Francisco Gamez, Candelaria Garcia and Ramona Garcia
Case Number: 3:2012cv03786
Filed: July 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Nancy Carina Lena, Eneas Vasquez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 Clerks Notice, 16 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Mediator Continuing Further CMC after Mediation filed by Nancy Carina Lena, Eneas Vasquez Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 11/15/12 AT 9:00 A.M. re 9 to Continue CMC filed by Nancy Carina Lena, Eneas Vasquez Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/12 (as modified). (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Gamez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Francisco Gamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candelaria Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eneas Vasquez
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?