Gressett v. Contra Costa County et al
Plaintiff: Michael Gressett
Defendant: Robert Kochly, Joyce Blair, Eric Ghisletta, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Jon Sylvia, Tom Simonetti, Darryl Jackson, O'Malley & McKenna Law Office, Peter Flores, Paul Mulligan, William Daniel O'Malley, Paul Sequeira, Tom McKenna, State of California Attorney General's Office, Brian Baker, City of Martinez, Contra Costa County, The State of California, Gene Greenwald and City of Martinez Police Department
Undetermined: Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2012cv03798
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Filing 246 WRIT of Execution issued as to Michael Gressett in the amount of $21,733.24. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 13, 2017 Electronic filing error Re: #245 MOTION for Writ Return of Writ of Execution filed by Contra Costa County. Incorrect event used [err101].Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 245 WRIT of Execution Returned Executed as to Michael Gressett. (Amenta, Janice) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/13/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2017 Electronic filing error Re: #244 MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Contra Costa County. There is currently an outstanding Writ (see document #243 ) which must be returned before a new Writ can be issued. Please do so by e-filing <<<<. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 244 MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Execution and Declaration of Janice L. Amenta filed by Contra Costa County. Responses due by 2/2/2017. Replies due by 2/9/2017. (Amenta, Janice) (Filed on 1/19/2017) Modified on 1/20/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2016 Filing 243 WRIT of Execution issued as to Michael Gressett in the amount of $21,657.48. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
May 5, 2016 Filing 242 MOTION for Writ of Garnishment and Declaration of Janice L. Amenta filed by Contra Costa County. Responses due by 5/19/2016. Replies due by 5/26/2016. (Amenta, Janice) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #238 Defendants' Motion for Review of the Clerk's Order on Taxation of Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 9, 2015 Filing 240 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 12/10/15 hearing on Motion for Taxation of Costs. Court to issue order on papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 239 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting motion as to #238 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs from 12/3/2015 to 12/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Opposition remains due 11/6/2015. Reply remains due 11/13/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 238 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/6/2015. Replies due by 11/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Boley iso County Defendants' Motion for Review of Clerk's Order on Taxation of Costs, #2 Proposed Order Granting County Defendants' Motion for Review of Clerk's Order on Taxation of Costs)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 237 Costs Taxed in amount of $16,280.24, Re: ECF No. 231 against Michael Gressett. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 236 CLERK'S Letter Spreading #235 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER of USCA granting Appellant's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal as to #232 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Gressett. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 234 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 3/28/2013, 2/12/2015 before Judge Edward M. Chen, Transcript Designation Form Transcript due by 5/6/2015. (Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 233 USCA Case Number 15-15655 for #232 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Gressett. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 6, 2015 Filing 232 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Michael Gressett re #229 Order, #230 Judgment. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9420061 paid) NOTICE OF APPEAL (Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 4/6/2015) Modified on 4/7/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF); (USCA Case No. 15-15655).
March 24, 2015 Filing 231 BILL OF COSTS by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D - E)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 230 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/10/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #203 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #227 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Motions in Limine and Pretrial Filings filed by Gene Greenwald, Contra Costa County, Paul Mulligan, Robert Kochly, Darryl Jackson, Paul Sequeira, Brian Baker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 227 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines for Motions in Limine and Pretrial Filings filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 226 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE OF 3/2/15 at 9:30 AM as to Plaintiffs and Defendant Contra Costa County before Chief Magistrate Joseph C. Spero pending decision on summary judgment. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 13, 2015 Filing 225 Letter from Todd Boley to Judge Chen re Missing Exhibit Page. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 13, 2015 Filing 224 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2015. re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Gene Greenwald, Contra Costa County, Paul Mulligan, Robert Kochly, Darryl Jackson, Paul Sequeira, Brian Baker. Under submission.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Debra Pas. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 223 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Status Conference Statement filed by Michael Gressett. (Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 11, 2015 Filing 222 CLERK'S NOTICE - MSJ and Status Conference set for 2/12/15 at 1:30 p.m. An update joint status report was due 2/5/15. Please e-file updated joint status report by 4:00 p.m. 2/11/15. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 221 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira Opposition to Plaintiff's Response to OSC Re Jane Doe Pseudonym. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Boley iso Defendants' Opposition, #2 Declaration of Peter Flores iso Defendants' Opposition)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiff's Response re #219 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Jane Doe. (Related document(s) #219 ) (Caleo, Paul) (Filed on 2/4/2015) Modified on 2/5/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2015 Filing 219 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael Gressett Pltf's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause why Pltf's Accuser should not be Referred to as Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jayme L. Walker iso Pltf's Opposition to the Court's Order to Show Cause)(Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 218 REPLY (re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #201 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Deposition and for Sanctions Against Deponent's Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #199 Plaintiff's Motion to Unseal Deposition of Jane Doe; Granting #202 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Parties Should Not be Required to Refer to Ms. Doe Pseudonymously. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 215 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 1/29/15 hearing on Motion #201. Court to issue order on papers. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 16, 2015 Filing 214 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING #201 MOTION for Sanctions and to Exclude Deposition from 1/22/2015 to 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 12, 2015 Filing 213 RESPONSE (re #203 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jayme L. Walker iso Pltf's Opposition to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration Exhibit A-G to Declaration of Jayme L. Walker, #3 Exhibit Exhibit H-K to Declaration of Jayme L. Walker, #4 Exhibit Exhibit L-N to Declaration of Jayme L. Walker, #5 Exhibit Exhibit O-S to Declaration of Jayme L. Walker, #6 Exhibit Exhibit S-X to Declaration of Jayme L. Walker, #7 Declaration Declaration of Amber Barrick iso Pltf's Opposition to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Declaration Declaration of Jan Duffy iso Pltf's Opposition to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Declaration Declaration of Thomas Fedor iso Pltf's Opposition to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Declaration Declaration of Michael Gressett iso Pltf's Opposition to Def's Motion for Summary Judgment, #11 Declaration Declaration of James Hammer)(Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 6, 2015 Filing 212 REPLY (re #201 MOTION for Sanctions and to Exclude Deposition ) To Def's Opp. to Pltf's Motion to Exclude Depo of Harpham filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service- Pltf's Reply to Def's Opp. to Pltf's Motion to Exclude Depo of Harpham)(Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 2, 2015 Filing 211 REPLY (re #201 MOTION for Sanctions and to Exclude Deposition ) Non-Party, Jane Doe's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Deposition of Jane Doe and for Sanctions Against Doe's Counsel filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Non-Party, Jane Doe's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Deposition of Jane Doe and for Sanctions Against Doe's Counsel)(Hamoy-Perera, Aimee) (Filed on 1/2/2015)
December 31, 2014 Filing 210 RESPONSE (re #201 MOTION for Sanctions and to Exclude Deposition ) filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Boley iso Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Depo of Jane Doe)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 209 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jane Doe. Amended Letter from Non-Party Jane Doe Re Discovery Motion. (Hamoy-Perera, Aimee) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 208 Letter from Non-Party Jane Doe Re Discovery Motion . (Hamoy-Perera, Aimee) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 29, 2014 Filing 207 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Depo of Holly Harpham by Michael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof Of Service: Proposed Order Granting Pltf's Motion to Exclude the Depo of Harpham)(Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 206 RESPONSE (re #202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits G, Z and EE to the Declaration of Todd Boley iso Defendants' MSJ ) Declaration and Memorandum of Law of Non-Party Jane Doe to Seal Certain Documents Attached to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Caleo, Paul) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 22, 2014 Filing 205 RESPONSE (re #199 Administrative Motion to Unseal the Deposition of Jane Doe ) Declaration and Memorandum of Law of Non-Party Jane Doe in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to Unseal the Deposition of Jane Doe filed byJane Doe. (Caleo, Paul) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 19, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Caleo & Aimee Hamoy-Perera (Caleo, Paul) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/12/2015. Replies due by 1/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Flores, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1 of Peter Flores, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2 iso Declaration of Peter Flores, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B iso Declaration of Peter Flores, #5 Declaration of Jon Sylvia, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 1 iso Sylvia Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C Part 2 iso Sylvia's Declaration, #8 Declaration of Todd Boley, #9 Exhibit Exh D - J iso Boley Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exh K - M iso Boley Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exh N - U iso Boley Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exh V - II iso Boley Declaration, #13 Proposed Order Granting Defs' MSJ)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits G, Z and EE to the Declaration of Todd Boley iso Defendants' MSJ filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd Boley iso Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Admin Motion, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit D - J, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibits K - M, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibits N - U, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibits V - II, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits D - F, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits G - J, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits K - M, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits N - U, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits V - II)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for Sanctions and to Exclude Deposition filed by Michael Gressett. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/2/2015. Replies due by 1/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec and Exhibits A-H, #2 Exhibit Exhibits I-L, #3 Exhibit Exhibits M-U, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 200 EXHIBITS re #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Unseal filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #199 ) (Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 199 Administrative Motion to Unseal the Deposition of Jane Doe filed by Michael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Walker, Jayme) (Filed on 12/18/2014) Modified on 12/19/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Page Limit on MSJ Brief filed by Gene Greenwald, Contra Costa County, Paul Mulligan, Robert Kochly, Darryl Jackson, Paul Sequeira, Brian Baker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exceed Page Limit on MSJ Brief filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Motion(s) due 12/18/2014. Responses due by 1/12/2015. Replies due by 1/26/2015. Motion Hearing/Status Conference set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Updated joint status report due 2/5/2015. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 8, 2014 Filing 195 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON DISPOSITIVE MOTION(S). Dispositive motion(s) must be filed by 12/18/2014. Opposition(s) due by 1/8/2015. Replies due by Tuesday 1/20/2015. Motion(s) Hearing reset from 1/22/2015 to 2/5/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE by Michael Gressett Notice of Attorney Name Change (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 193 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/16/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:22 - 11:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #191 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2015. (Related documents(s) #191 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 192 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 10/16/14. (Recording #FTR 11:22-11:44.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Michael Gressett for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 190 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
September 16, 2014 Filing 189 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE Status Report due by 10/9/2014. Status Conference reset for 10/16/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 188 Letter from J. Gary Gwilliam . (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 187 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Status from 10/16/14 at 10:30 a.m. to Tuesday 10/7/14 at 2:30 p.m. Status Report due by 9/30/2014. Status Conference set for 10/7/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 186 NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd Alexander Boley (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/28/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 184 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/28/2014 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further settlement conference set for 3/3/15. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2014)
June 20, 2014 Filing 183 CLERKS NOTICE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. A conference call number has already been arranged by Mr. Gwilliam's Office and circulated to all counsel and the Court. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/30/2014. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/13/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/26/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/27/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/29/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 181 Letter from Counsel for Both Parties . (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER THEREON (as to Def. William O'Malley only). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 29, 2014 Filing 180 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/29/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 5/29/2014). Status Report due by 10/9/2014. Status Conference set for 10/16/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury trial set for 5/4/15.(Recording #10:37-10:55.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2014)
May 29, 2014 Filing 178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER THEREON filed by William Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER EXCUSING WILLIAM O'MALLEY'S COUNSEL FROM 5/29/14 CMC re #176 Letter filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/28/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 176 Letter from A. Byrne Conley Re. Case Management Confrence. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 175 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint CMC Statement filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 174 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 5/8/14 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case partially settled. (Recording #SEALED FTR 3:20-3:29.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/5/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 31, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 Filing 171 Letter re selection of Magistrate. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 170 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/23/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 1/27/2014). Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #1055-1113.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 169 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third) byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 168 Defendants ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 167 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint CMC Statement filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 20, 2013 Filing 166 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2013 before Judge Edward M.Chen (Date Filed: 12/20/2013). Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #922-925.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #131 #141 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; and Denying #143 Defendant O'Malley's Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 164 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint CMC Statement filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Michael Gressett, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, William Daniel O'Malley, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 163 Letter from Gibbons & Conley to Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #127 Defendant Blair's Motion to Dismiss; granting #128 Defendant McKenna's Motion to Dismiss; and granting #137 Defendant Sylvia's Motion to Dismiss (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 161 NOTICE of Change of Address by Austin Byrne Conley, Jr (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 160 CLERKS NOTICE resetting CMC to 12/19/13 at 9:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 159 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE - THE 9/19/13 MOTIONS ARE VACATED (Docket #s 127, 128, 131, 137, 141 and 143). THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 158 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING 9/19/13 MOTIONS HEARING (Docket #s 127, 128, 131, 137, 141 and 143). THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 157 REPLY (re #143 First MOTION to Strike #120 Amended Complaint Third ) in Support of filed byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Defendant William Daniel O'Malley in Support of Anti-SLAPP Motion As To Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 156 OBJECTIONS to re #149 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, the Declaration of Mark Harrison by William Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 155 REPLY (re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ) filed byJon Sylvia. (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 154 REPLY (re #141 First MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ) filed byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 153 REPLY (re #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint ) filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 152 REPLY (re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) filed byTom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 151 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joyce Blair re #150 Reply to Opposition/Response, Certificate of Service (Fong, Wilfred) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 150 REPLY (re #127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) Defendant Joyce Blair's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed byJoyce Blair. (Fong, Wilfred) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 149 RESPONSE (re #143 First MOTION to Strike #120 Amended Complaint Third ) filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Harrison, #2 Declaration Jayme L. Burns Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Continued 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A Continued 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A Continued 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B Continued, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C Continued, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C Continued 2, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C Continued 3, #13 Exhibit Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D Continued, #15 Exhibit Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit Exhibit E Continued, #17 Exhibit Exhibit E continued 2, #18 Exhibit Exhibit E Continued 3, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 32, #20 Exhibit Exhibit F, #21 Proof of Service)(Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 148 RESPONSE (re #141 First MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #137 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, #128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint ) filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 147 CLERKS NOTICE CLARIFYING ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF (Docket 145) - County Defendants' reply limited to 25 pages. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part #145 Motion to file opposition up to 50 pages (modified). (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 145 MOTION Additional Pages for Consolidated Opposition filed by Michael Gressett. Responses due by 8/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 144 Joinder re #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint by Joyce Blair. (Hamilton, David) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 7, 2013 ***Briefing schedule modified for Motions: 127, 128, 131, 137, 141, and 143 (per prior stipulation). Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. Hearing set for 9/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 ***Motions terminated: #132 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint filed by Gene Greenwald, Contra Costa County, Paul Mulligan, Robert Kochly, Darryl Jackson, Paul Sequeira, Brian Baker. See #131. #132 is the Declaration. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 143 First MOTION to Strike #120 Amended Complaint Third filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 142 Proposed Order re #137 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (FRCP 12(b)(6) by Jon Sylvia. (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 141 First MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 140 Request for Judicial Notice filed byJon Sylvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs A-D to RJN, #2 Exhibit Exs E-F to RJN, #3 Exhibit Ex G (part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit Ex G (part 2 of 2))(Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 139 Proposed Order re #132 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint, #134 Declaration in Support, #136 Declaration in Support, #135 Declaration in Support, #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint, #138 Exhibits,, #133 Declaration in Support, by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 138 EXHIBITS re #132 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint, #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint Addl Exhibits to Boley Dec filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh D, #2 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh E, #3 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh G, #4 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh I part 1, #5 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh I part 2, #6 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh J, #7 Exhibit Boley Dec Exh K)(Related document(s) #132 , #131 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Jon Sylvia. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/20/2013. Replies due by 8/27/2013. (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 136 Declaration of Wanda Mcadoo filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 135 Declaration of Paul Sequeria in Support of #132 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint, #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #132 , #131 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 134 Declaration of Darryl Jackson in Support of #132 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint, #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #132 , #131 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified on 8/7/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 Filing 133 Declaration of Brian Baker in Support of #132 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint, #131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #132 , #131 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 132 Declaration of Todd Boley in Support re #131 MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh C, #3 Exhibit Exh F, #4 Exhibit Exh H, #5 Exhibit Exh L)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013) Modified on 8/7/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 Filing 131 First MOTION to Dismiss 3rd Amended Complaint filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/23/2013. Replies due by 8/30/2013. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 130 Proposed Order re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Tom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE by Tom McKenna re #128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Tom McKenna. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/20/2013. Replies due by 8/27/2013. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 Filing 127 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Joyce Blair. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/20/2013. Replies due by 8/27/2013. (Hamilton, David) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #124 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 125 Proposed Order re #124 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Contra Costa County. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Contra Costa County. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #122 To Set Briefing Schedule and Continue CMC filed by Joyce Blair, Contra Costa County, Tom McKenna, Michael Gressett, Jon Sylvia, Darryl Jackson, William Daniel O'Malley, Brian Baker, City of Martinez, Gene Greenwald, Paul Mulligan, Robert Kochly, Paul Sequeira Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2013. Case Management Conference reset for 10/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 28, 2013 Filing 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Set Briefing Schedule and Continue CMC filed by Brian Baker, Joyce Blair, City of Martinez, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Michael Gressett, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Tom McKenna, Paul Mulligan, William Daniel O'Malley, Paul Sequeira, Jon Sylvia. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gressett re #120 Amended Complaint Third (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 120 AMENDED COMPLAINT THIRD against All Defendants. Filed byMichael Gressett. (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
May 21, 2013 Filing 119 CLERKS NOTICE setting CMC for 7/18/13 at 9:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part O'Malley's and McKenna's Anti-SLAPP Motions #73 #75 #79 #92 #93 #94 . (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gressett (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayme L. Burns (Burns, Jayme) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gressett (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 114 OBJECTION to Defendants' Supplementary Materials re #113 Letter of Todd Boley filed by Michael Gressett. (Related document(s) #113 ) (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 4/26/2013) Modified on 4/29/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2013 Filing 113 Letter from Todd Boley 9th Cir Opinion relevant to Mtn to Dismiss. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 112 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2013 before Edward M. Chen. Court to issue order and to set further CMC date (Date Filed: 3/28/2013). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 111 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brian Baker, Joyce Blair, City of Martinez, Contra Costa County, Peter Flores, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Tom McKenna, Paul Mulligan, William Daniel O'Malley, Paul Sequeira, Tom Simonetti, State of California, Jon Sylvia. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 110 REPLY (re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Defs City of Martinez, et al's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities ) filed byCity of Martinez, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. (Allen, Dale) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 109 RESPONSE (re #93 First MOTION to Strike #65 Amended Complaint (Anti-SLAPP) ) Reply Brief in Support of O'Malley 2nd Anti-SLAPP Motion filed byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 108 RESPONSE (re #92 First MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) Reply Brief in Support of O'Malley's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 107 REPLY (re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike ) filed byTom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 106 REPLY (re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
March 13, 2013 Filing 105 REPLY (re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byJoyce Blair, Peter Flores, State of California. (Hamilton, David) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gressett re #101 Opposition/Response to Motion, #99 Opposition/Response to Motion, #103 Opposition/Response to Motion, #100 Opposition/Response to Motion, #102 Opposition/Response to Motion (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 103 RESPONSE (re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) to State of California, etc. filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 102 RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) to Contra Costa County, et al. filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 101 RESPONSE (re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Defs City of Martinez, et al's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities ) to City of Martinez, et al. filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 100 RESPONSE (re #92 First MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) to defendant O'Malley filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 25, 2013 Filing 99 RESPONSE (re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike ) filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 98 Proposed Order re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Defs City of Martinez, et al's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities Prop Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by City of Martinez, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 97 Request for Judicial Notice re #94 MOTION to Dismiss Defs City of Martinez, et al's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities filed byCity of Martinez, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs A-D to RJN, #2 Exhibit Exs E-F to RJN, #3 Exhibit Ex G (part 1 of 2) to RJN, #4 Exhibit Ex G (part 2 of 2) to RJN)(Related document(s) #94 ) (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 96 Declaration of Jon Sylvia in Support of #94 MOTION to Dismiss Defs City of Martinez, et al's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities filed byCity of Martinez, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. (Related document(s) #94 ) (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 95 Declaration of Kevin P. Allen filed byCity of Martinez, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs A-B to KP Allen Decl, #2 Exhibit Ex C (part 1 of 2) to KP Allen Decl, #3 Exhibit Ex C (part 2 of 2) to KP Allen Decl, #4 Exhibit Exs D-E to KP Allen Decl)(Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss Defs City of Martinez, et al's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; Points and Authorities filed by City of Martinez, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/25/2013. Replies due by 3/14/2013. (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 93 First MOTION to Strike #65 Amended Complaint (Anti-SLAPP) filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/8/2013. Replies due by 2/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 92 First MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/8/2013. Replies due by 2/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 91 Proposed Order re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 90 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit I filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 89 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit H filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 88 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit G filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 87 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit F filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 86 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit E filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 85 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit D filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 84 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Ex. C Part 2 of 2 filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 83 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Ex. C Part 1 of 2 filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 82 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit B filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 81 EXHIBITS re #80 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibit A filed byPaul Mulligan. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 80 Request for Judicial Notice re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Declaration of Todd Boley filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #79 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/8/2013. Replies due by 2/15/2013. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 78 Proposed Order re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike by Tom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 77 Declaration of James V. Fitzgerald, III in Support of #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike filed byTom McKenna. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE by Tom McKenna re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 25, 2013 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike filed by Tom McKenna. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/25/2013. Replies due by 3/14/2013. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 74 Proposed Order Granting Motion by Defendants State of California, Joyce Blair, and Peter Flores to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Joyce Blair, Peter Flores, State of California Attorney General's Office. (Hamilton, David) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Joyce Blair, Peter Flores, State of California Attorney General's Office. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/7/2013. Replies due by 2/14/2013. (Hamilton, David) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boley, Todd) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on defendants' motions to dismiss filed by Michael Gressett Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on defendants' motions to dismiss filed by Michael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 21, 2012 Filing 68 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/21/2012 before Edward M. Chen Defendants motions to dismiss set for 3/28/13 at 1:30 p.m. Discovery is stayed. ADR referral is deferred after ruling on the motions to dismiss. Further CMC is set for Thursday 3/28/13 at 1:30 p.m. ADR and phase I discovery will be discussed at that time. An updated joint CMC Statement shall be filed by 3/21/13. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint CMC Statement filed by Brian Baker, Joyce Blair, City of Martinez, Contra Costa County, Peter Flores, Gene Greenwald, Michael Gressett, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Tom McKenna, Paul Mulligan, William Daniel O'Malley, Paul Sequeira, Tom Simonetti, State of California, Jon Sylvia. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 10, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance Joyce Blair, Peter Flores OF NEW COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS (Hamilton, David) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 6, 2012 Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against All Defendants. Filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 12/21/12 at 9:00 a.m. re #63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michael Gressett Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Re Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Strike, and Directing Parties to Meet and Confer re Second Amended Complaint. Case Management/Status Conference Statement due by 11/23/2012. Case Management/Status Conference set for 11/30/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 61 REPLY (re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) DEFENDANTS' REPLY FOR MTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCity of Martinez, City of Martinez Police Department, Eric Ghisletta, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 60 REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 59 REPLY (re #47 First MOTION to Strike #27 Amended Complaint ) filed byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 58 REPLY (re #46 First MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byWilliam Daniel O'Malley. (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 57 OBJECTIONS to re #53 Request for Judicial Notice, by Tom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 56 REPLY (re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byTom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 55 REPLY BRIEF in Support of #40 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants filed by Joyce Blair, Peter Flores, State of California. (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 10/19/2012) Modified on 10/22/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2012 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gressett re #51 Opposition/Response to Motion, #49 Opposition/Response to Motion, #50 Opposition/Response to Motion, #48 Opposition/Response to Motion, #53 Request for Judicial Notice, #52 Opposition/Response to Motion (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 53 Request for Judicial Notice re #51 Opposition/Response to Motion, #49 Opposition/Response to Motion, #50 Opposition/Response to Motion, #48 Opposition/Response to Motion, #52 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #51 , #49 , #50 , #48 , #52 ) (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) Pltf's Opposition to def. McKenna's Motion to Dismiss filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 51 RESPONSE (re #43 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) pltfs' opposition to defs contra costa county, et al. motion to dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 50 RESPONSE (re #42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) Pltf's Opposition to Def's Mtn to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 49 RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF BY DEFENDANTS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JOYCE BLAIR, AND PETER FLORES ) Pltf's Opposition to Def. State of California, Joyce Blair and Peter Flores Mtn to Dismissis Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 48 RESPONSE (re #46 First MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) Pltf oppos to O'Malley's Motion to dismiss pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) filed byMichael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 47 First MOTION to Strike #27 Amended Complaint filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/5/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 46 First MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/5/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 45 Proposed Order re #43 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 9/7/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 Filing 44 Declaration of Todd Boley in Support of #43 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Declaration of Todd Boley and Request for Judicial Notice filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Related document(s) #43 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/5/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by City of Martinez, City of Martinez Police Department, Eric Ghisletta, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/5/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice; Exhibits A through E to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F and G to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Jon Sylvia; Exhibits A through D to Sylvia Declaration, #4 Declaration of Kevin P. Allen; Exhibits A through C to Allen Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Larsen, Dirk) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 41 Proposed Order re #40 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF BY DEFENDANTS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JOYCE BLAIR, AND PETER FLORES by Joyce Blair, Peter Flores, State of California Attorney General's Office. (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF BY DEFENDANTS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JOYCE BLAIR, AND PETER FLORES filed by Joyce Blair, Peter Flores, State of California Attorney General's Office. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 39 Request for Judicial Notice re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byTom McKenna. (Related document(s) #36 ) (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 38 Proposed Order re #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Tom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 37 Declaration of James V. Fitzgerald, III in Support of #36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byTom McKenna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit B Con't)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Tom McKenna. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/5/2012. Replies due by 10/19/2012. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE by Tom McKenna of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue case management conference and set hearing on motions to dismiss and briefing schedule filed by Michael Gressett Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/30/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 28, 2012 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue case management conference and set hearing on motions to dismiss and briefing schedule filed by Michael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 32 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 21, 2012 Filing 31 Notice of Withdrawal of #11 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Responses due by 9/4/2012. Replies due by 9/11/2012. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 8/21/2012) Modified on 8/22/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2012 Filing 30 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion REQUEST TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Filing 29 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss by O'Malley (Conley, Austin) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 First MOTION to Dismiss , #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1). Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF STATE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Docket No. 7) (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 15, 2012 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byMichael Gressett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER, (25>to continue hearing on motions to dismiss and briefing schedule, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Responses due by 8/17/2012. Replies due by 8/24/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF BY DEFENDANTS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JOYCE BLAIR AND PETER FLORES, #21 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #11 First MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1). Responses due by 8/31/2012. Replies due by 9/14/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue hearing on motions to dismiss and briefing schedule filed by Michael Gressett. (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Gressett (Gwilliam, J.) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 21 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by William Daniel O'Malley. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conley, Austin) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Martinez, City of Martinez Police Department, Eric Ghisletta, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) PROOF OF SERVICE RE: MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) (Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1) filed byTom McKenna. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1) by Tom McKenna. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 17 Declaration of James V. Fitzgerald, III in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1) filed byTom McKenna. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE by Tom McKenna re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1) (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6), and Motion to Strike Under CCP Section 425.16(b)(1) filed by Tom McKenna. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Fitzgerald, James) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira Personal Service of Notice to District Court of Removal, Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Assignment to US Mag. Judge, Consent to Proceed bf. Magistrate & Request for Reassignment, Order Setting Initial Case Mgmt and ADR Deadlines, WElcome to US Dist Court SF, USDC ND Cal ECF Registration, USDC Consent to Magistrate Handout, and Notice Regarding Cameras in Courtroom Pilot Program (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 13 Proposed Order re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 12 Declaration of Todd Boley in Support of #11 First MOTION to Dismiss Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits A through I filed byBrian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Boley, Todd) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 27, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by City of Martinez, City of Martinez Police Department, Eric Ghisletta, Tom Simonetti, Jon Sylvia. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin P. Allen, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jon Sylvia, #3 Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibits A-E, #4 Exhibit Exhibits F-G to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6))(Allen, Kevin) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of California Attorney General's Office PROOF OF SERVICE (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 8 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANTS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JOYCE BLAIR AND PETER FLORES TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by State of California Attorney General's Office. (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 26, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF BY DEFENDANTS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, JOYCE BLAIR AND PETER FLORES filed by State of California Attorney General's Office. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/9/2012. Replies due by 8/16/2012. (Pon, Tyler) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/25/12. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 23, 2012 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 23, 2012 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order All Judges)(dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal to Plaintiff filed by Brian Baker, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Gene Greenwald, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Paul Mulligan, Paul Sequeira (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C12-01302. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 44611009134). Filed byGene Greenwald, Contra Costa County, Paul Mulligan, Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office, Paul Sequeira, Darryl Jackson, Robert Kochly, Brian Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Receipt)(dsc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gressett v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kochly
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Blair
Represented By: David Warren Hamilton
Represented By: Tyler Bruce Pon, Esq.
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ghisletta
Represented By: Dirk Donald Larsen
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Sylvia
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Dirk Donald Larsen
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Simonetti
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Dirk Donald Larsen
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Jackson
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Malley & McKenna Law Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Flores
Represented By: David Warren Hamilton
Represented By: Tyler Bruce Pon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mulligan
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Daniel O'Malley
Represented By: Austin Byrne Conley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sequeira
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom McKenna
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Attorney General's Office
Represented By: David Warren Hamilton
Represented By: Tyler Bruce Pon, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Baker
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Martinez
Represented By: Dale L. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Dirk Donald Larsen
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Represented By: Janice Lynn Amenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Represented By: David Warren Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Greenwald
Represented By: Todd Alexander Boley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Martinez Police Department
Represented By: Dirk Donald Larsen
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jane Doe
Represented By: Aimee G. Hamoy
Represented By: Paul Caleo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gressett
Represented By: J. Gary Gwilliam
Represented By: Jayme L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?