McCoy v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Danny L. McCoy
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv03821
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/17/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER vacating March 19, 2013 status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/13/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/7/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 11:00 am. on 3/28/2013 in Courtroom 14, 18th Floor, San Francisco, is reset for 1:00 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/27/13. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/11/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?