De La Cruz v. Avatar Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeny De La Cruz
Defendant: Saru Saini, Ashok Kumar, Avatar Group, Inc., Avatar Holdings, Inc and Kala Ubhi
Case Number: 3:2012cv03825
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/29/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO COURT'S ADR PROGRAM FOR MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 19, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 18 Proposed Order, filed by Saru Saini, Kala Ubhi, Avatar Group, Inc., Avatar Holdings, Inc, Ashok Kumar. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 6, 2012. The parties shall contact Court Call at 888-882-6878 to make arrangements to appear by telephone. Please use the ECF event "Appear by Telephone" for future requests. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Cruz v. Avatar Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saru Saini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashok Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avatar Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avatar Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kala Ubhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeny De La Cruz
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?