McFarland v. Lau
Plaintiff: Bill McFarland
Defendant: Donald Lau
Case Number: 3:2012cv03829
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 51 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/19/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 2/11/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO CONDUCT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/29/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION to Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2013. Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill McFarland
Represented By: Louis (Michael) Alexander Boli, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?