Stitt et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Stitt, Ronald Stitt, Judi Shatzer, Mark Zirlott and Terri Louise Zirlott
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. and CitiMortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03892
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 176 Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Entitlement to Catalyst Fee Award. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 173 Motion re Incorrectly Filed Document. Clerk is directed to permanently lock Docket Entries 169-3, 169-6, 170, and 170-1. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 176 MOTION for Order Entitling Plaintiffs to Catalyst Fee Award filed by Gloria Stitt, Terri Louise Zirlott, Ronald Stitt, Mark Zirlott. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/19/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER RE: PRE-FILING LETTERS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER REGARDING COURTESY COPIES re Dkt. No. 165. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/14/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO FILE RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/9/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 70 Motion to Dismiss without Leave to Amend (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATED F.R.E. 502(d) ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/17/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stitt et al v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Stitt
Represented By: Daniel Alberstone
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Stitt
Represented By: Daniel Alberstone
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judi Shatzer
Represented By: Daniel Alberstone
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Zirlott
Represented By: Daniel Alberstone
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Louise Zirlott
Represented By: Daniel Alberstone
Represented By: Mark Philip Pifko
Represented By: Roland K. Tellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Steven Edward Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Edward Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?