Pag-Daly City, LLC v. Quality Auto Locators, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Pag-Daly City, LLC
Defendant: Joseph T of D CO, Quality Auto Locators, Inc, Chad M. Petro, Herb Chambers 1168, Inc., PLE Enterprises, Inc., Page Imports, Inc., Faulkner Trevose, Inc., Bert Wolfe, Inc., Muller Automotive, Inc., Walker Auto Group, Inc., Lafontaine Motors, Inc. and Charles Barker Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03907
Filed: July 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER RE OCTOBER 30 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 29, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE OF LEGAL HELP CENTER RESOURCES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 30, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Response due October 1. Opposition due October 14 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Motion due by September 26, 2014 at noon. Response due by October 10, 2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Deadline September 15, 2014, at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING RE CHARLES BARKER'S DISCOVERY LETTER [re 373 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Charles Barker Enterprises, Inc.]. Responses due by 5:00 PM 5/12/2014. Three-hour meet-and-confer in Court� 39;s jury room starting from 7:30 AM and continuing to 10:30 AM 5/13/2014. Discovery Hearing set for 5/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/12/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER PERMITTING BRANSON, BRINKOP, GRIFFITH & STRONG, LLP, TO CONDITIONALLY WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR JOSHUA BEST AND ALL CAR AUTO FINDERS, LLC [re 371 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Joshua Best, All Car Auto Finders, LLC]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/7/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CHARLES BARKER'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR MISJOINDER by Judge William Alsup [denying 345 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER REGARDING BRANSON, BRINKOP, GRIFFITH & STRONG, LLPS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR JOSHUA BEST AND ALL CAR AUTO FINDERS, LLC re 352 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Joshua Best, All Car Auto Finders, LLC, 353 Stipulation filed by Joshua Best, All Car Auto Finders, LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE AND EXTENDING DEADLINES ON MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT CHARLES BARKER by Hon. William Alsup granting 350 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 318 Motion Good Faith Settlement.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE, SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 309 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING HEARING ON FEBRUARY 6. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 307 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW OLTMAN MATHEWS 304 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 298 . Settlement Conference is continued to 11/21/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/26/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DISMISS denying 196 Motion to Dismiss; terminating 199 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; finding as moot 276 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER denying 189 Request. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 19, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER R. JOHNSON PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 184 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE re 183 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Pag-Daly City, LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER DENYING APPEARANCE BY TELEPHONE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 179 Motion to Appear by Telephone].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING PITTENGER PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 176 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE DEPOSITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING BOWDEN PHV by Judge Alsup terminating 157 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 159 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER HOLDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN ABEYANCE PENDING DISCOVERY AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup deferring ruling on 79 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 80 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 81 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 83 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 87 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 89 Motion to Dismiss for La ck of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 91 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 93 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 94 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; deferring ruling on 122 Stipulation; finding as moot 140 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; finding as moot 150 Motion for Extension of Time to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Joseph T of D CO]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/16/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 37 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 30 Stipulation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 9 Proposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, MO TION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, Proposed Order re, 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, ; granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pag-Daly City, LLC v. Quality Auto Locators, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph T of D CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Auto Locators, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad M. Petro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Chambers 1168, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLE Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page Imports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner Trevose, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Wolfe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muller Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafontaine Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Barker Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pag-Daly City, LLC
Represented By: William Arthur Logan, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Michelle Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?