Gearon v. Clarus Transphase Scientific, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Gearon
Defendant: Clarus Transphase Scientific, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv03931
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE granting in part and denying in part 33 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION: Judgment Debtor Exam set for 9/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/29/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED against Defendant Clarus Transphase Scientific, Inc. in the amount of $199,665.14 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gearon v. Clarus Transphase Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gearon
Represented By: Randall S. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarus Transphase Scientific, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?