Circle Click Media LLC v. Regus Management Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC and CTNY Insurance Group LLC
Defendant: Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc and HQ Global Workplaces LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv04000
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MANDATE of USCA as to #427 Notice of Appeal, filed by Circle Click Media LLC "The judgment of this Court, entered November 29, 2018, takes effect this date." (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2018: #1 Supplement) Memorandum 11/29/2018
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 434 NOTICE by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc Of Change of Firm Name And Email Addresses (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ali Ari Aalaei (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE of Change of Address by S. Chandler Visher (Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-30-16, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #430 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (Related documents(s) #430 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/30/16 before Edward M. Chen by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 02/24/16; 06/30/16 before Judge EMC, re #427 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 3/13/2017. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 428 USCA Case Number 17-15088 for #427 Notice of Appeal filed by Circle Click Media LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 427 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Circle Click Media LLC. Appeal of Judgment #426 , Order on Motion for Leave to File #395 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment #404 , Order #374 . (Appeal fee of $505 paid; receipt number 0971-11069518) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/12/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (USCA Case No. 17-15088)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 NOTICE by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc Notice of Lodging of Proposed Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 CLERK'S NOTICE. Status Conference reset from 12/8/2016 to 12/22/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 12/15/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Defendants' Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Rule 68)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #421 Stipulation to dismiss counterclaims only filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc, HQ Global Workplaces LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counterclaims filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #419 To Enlarge Time For Discovery And Notice of Potential Settlement filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, HQ Global Workplaces LLC Discovery due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/25/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Enlarge Time For Discovery And Notice of Potential Settlement filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 CLERK'S NOTICE. Status Conference set for 12/8/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 12/1/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #408 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2016 re #408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Total Time in Court: 53 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2016)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 REPLY (re #408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave to Amend)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 RESPONSE (re #408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Marshall Declaration ISO Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 5/8/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. 4-court day Jury Trial set for 5/8/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Discovery due by 10/27/2016. Jury Trial set for 5/9/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/10/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 5/12/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2016. Status Report due by 9/8/2016. Status Conference set for 9/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.FTR Time 10:42-10:58. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2016)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 410 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #409 Declaration in Support, #408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of #408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #408 ) (Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Circle Click Media LLC. (Visher, S.) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER of USCA denying the petition for permission to appeal the district court's 3/11/16 order denying class action certification. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #393 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2016 re #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc, HQ Global Workplaces LLC. Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Total Time in Court 31 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiff Attorney: S. Chandler Visher and Ali Aalaei. Defendant Attorney: Tracy Talbot and Stephanie Blazewicz. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying #399 Administrative Motion to File Additional Memorandum. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 CLERK'S NOTICE as to #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial]. Motion Hearing reset for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 RESPONSE (re #399 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for approval to add memo re #398 Reply to Opposition/Response,, ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for approval to add memo re #398 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Circle Click Media LLC. Responses due by 5/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 5/26/2016) Modified on 5/27/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 REPLY (re #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] ) Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Injunctive Relief Available to Plaintiffs filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Defendants' Reply Brief on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 RESPONSE (re #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Visher, S.) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 CLERK'S NOTICE as to #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial]. Motion Hearing reset from 6/2/2016 to 6/9/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #381 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Proposed Order re #393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Partial] filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/12/2016. Replies due by 5/19/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit (S) A through C to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support, #*** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #394 . *** (3) Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 4/28/2016) Modified on 4/28/2016 (fff, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 24, 2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #385 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2016. (Related documents(s) #385 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/16/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Supplemental Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support re #386 Renewed MOTION for Class Certification (Unredacted Version) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 REPLY in Support (re #386 Renewed MOTION for Class Certification (Unredacted Version)) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell in Support re #386 Renewed MOTION for Class Certification (Unredacted Version) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 EXHIBITS 21- 41 in Support re #387 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in support of Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 21, #2 Exhibit Ex. 22, #3 Exhibit Ex. 23, #4 Exhibit Ex. 24, #5 Exhibit Ex. 25, #6 Exhibit Ex. 26, #7 Exhibit Ex. 27, #8 Exhibit Ex. 28, #9 Exhibit Ex. 29, #10 Exhibit Ex. 30, #11 Exhibit Ex. 31, #12 Exhibit Ex. 32, #13 Exhibit Ex. 33, #14 Exhibit Ex. 34, #15 Exhibit Ex. 35, #16 Exhibit Ex. 36, #17 Exhibit Ex. 37, #18 Exhibit Ex. 38, #19 Exhibit Ex. 39, #20 Exhibit Ex. 40, #21 Exhibit Ex. 41)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support re #386 Renewed MOTION for Class Certification (Unredacted Version) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Renewed MOTION for Class Certification (Unredacted Version) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/11/2016) Modified on 4/12/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 24, 2016 before Edward M. Chen by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER Granting-in-Part and Denying-in-Part #347 #358 #360 Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 RESPONSE (re #381 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) By Defendants In Support Of Administrative Motions To File Documents Under Seal filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Proposed Order re #381 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Visher, S.) (Filed on 3/27/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Circle Click Media LLC. (Visher, S.) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #378 and #375 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc, HQ Global Workplaces LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/25/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/24/2016. Defendants motion for partial adjudication Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.FTR Time 10:45-11:13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #375 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #347 #358 #360 Motions to Seal Without Prejudice.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER Denying #345 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/11/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER (filed UNDER SEAL) by Judge Edward M. Chen DENYING #345 MOTION to Certify Class..(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 24, 2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #370 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2016. (Related documents(s) #370 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 2/24/2016 re #345 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Total Time in Court 1:37. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney S. Chandler Visher, Ali Aalaei, Craig Ramsdell. Defendant Attorney Chris Schmidt, Lee Marshall, Tracy Talbot. Interpreter N/A.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/24/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME OF HEARING: #345 MOTION to Certify Class . The time of the Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2016 has been changed from 2:30 PM to 03:45 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING re: #345 Motion to Certify Class. Motion Hearing RESET from 2/26/2016 TO 2/24/2016 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before the Honorable Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Proposed Order re #345 MOTION to Certify Class by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Visher, S.) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting #345 MOTION to Certify Class from 2/25/2016 to Friday 2/26/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting #345 MOTION to Certify Class from 2/18/2016 to 2/25/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Further Case Management Conference reset from 2/18/2016 to 3/24/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Response re #360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in support of Renewed Motion to Certify Class byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in support of Renewed Motion to Certify Class (Visher, S.) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of #361 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Supp. Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Supp. Aalaei Decl. (unredacted version of document submitted under seal in connection with ECF No. 360), #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Supp. Aalaei Decl.)(Related document(s) #361 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REPLY (re #345 MOTION to Certify Class ) (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Visher, S.) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in support of Renewed Motion to Certify Class filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Re Sealing of Documents, #3 Exhibit Redacted Reply Memorandum, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Reply Memorandum, #5 Exhibit Redacted Supplemental Aalaei Declaration, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Supplemental Aalaei Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B to Supplemental Aalaei Declaration)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Declaration of K. Lee Marshall in Support of #358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Class Certification And Declarations of Lorraine Veber And Robert Gaudreau filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #358 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition To Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Class Certification And Declarations of Lorraine Veber And Robert Gaudreau filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Redacted Opposition to Plfs' Renewed Mtn for Class Cert, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Unredacted Opposition to Plfs' Renewed Mtn for Class Cert, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Redacted Veber Decl, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D Unredacted Veber Decl, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E Redacted Gaudreau Decl, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F Unredacted Gaudreau Decl, #7 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part #355 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. The page limit for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification shall be extended to thirty (30) pages. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 RESPONSE (re #355 MOTION for Leave to File To Exceed Page Limit For Opposition To Plf's Renewed Motion For Class Certification: Declaration of K. Lee Marshall ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MOTION for Leave to File To Exceed Page Limit For Opposition To Plf's Renewed Motion For Class Certification: Declaration of K. Lee Marshall filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 RESPONSE to re #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nicole Hayes, #2 Declaration Lorraine Veber)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #352 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc, HQ Global Workplaces LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification (Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Declaration of Raymond Fullerton of CTNY Insurance Group LLC in Support of #345 MOTION to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to CTNY Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. B to CTNY Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. C to CTNY Decl.)(Related document(s) #345 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Declaration of Anne A. Ward of Circle Click Media LLC in Support of #345 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #345 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 EXHIBITS re #347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Aalaei Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Aalaei Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Aalaei Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Aalaei Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Aalaei Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. 18 to Aalaei Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Aalaei Decl., #12 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Aalaei Decl., #13 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Aalaei Decl., #14 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Aalaei Decl., #15 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Aalaei Decl., #16 Exhibit Ex. 25 to Aalaei Decl., #17 Exhibit Ex. 26 to Aalaei Decl., #18 Exhibit Ex. 27 to Aalaei Decl., #19 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Aalaei Decl., #20 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl., #21 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl., #22 Exhibit Ex. 32 to Aalaei Decl., #23 Exhibit Ex. 33 to Aalaei Decl., #24 Exhibit Ex. 34 to Aalaei Decl.)(Related document(s) #347 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Visher Decl. ISO Admin Mtn, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Motion to Certify Class, #4 Exhibit Redacted Motion to Certify Class, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Ramsdell Decl., #6 Exhibit Redacted Ramsdell Decl., #7 Exhibit Unredacted Aalaei Decl., #8 Exhibit Redacted Aalaei)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of #345 MOTION to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Aalaei Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Aalaei Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Aalaei Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Aalaei Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. 24 to Aalaei Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. 31 to Aalaei Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex. 35 to Aalaei Decl., #12 Exhibit Ex. 36 to Aalaei Decl., #13 Exhibit Ex. 37 to Aalaei Decl., #14 Exhibit Ex. 38 to Aalaei Decl., #15 Exhibit Ex. 39 to Aalaei Decl., #16 Exhibit Ex. 40 to Aalaei Decl., #17 Exhibit Ex. 41 to Aalaei Decl.)(Related document(s) #345 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 1/19/2016. Replies due by 2/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/10/2015. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion for class certification set for 2/18/16 at 1:30 p.m.Court Reporter Name Pam Batalo. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2015)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #340 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Case Management Statement) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC Pursuant to Judge Edward M. Chen's Case Management Conference Order in Reassigned Case (Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Dismiss [ECF NO. 335] filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File A Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying MTD, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying MTD)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #337 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc, HQ Global Workplaces LLC Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 12/10/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #337 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration K. Lee Marshall ISO Stip)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #311 Motion to Exclude Expert Reports ; denying without prejudice #238 Motion to Certify Class; denying #271 Motion to Dismiss; denying #272 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #273 Motion for Bond; finding as moot #283 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs may file a revised Motion to Certify Class within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this order. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #322 Motion for Special Setting and Evidentiary Hearing ; finding as moot #327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot #332 Motion to Strike Reply. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 RESPONSE (re #332 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Strike Reply in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion (ECF No. 330) re #330 Reply to Opposition/Response, ) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion (ECF No. 332) to Strike Reply in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion (ECF No. 330) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Strike Reply in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion (ECF No. 330) re #330 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Responses due by 9/25/2015. Replies due by 10/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 RESPONSE (re #327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Unredacted Versions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defednants' Administrative Motion for Special Setting and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Declaration of S. Chandler Visher ISO Opposition filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 REPLY (re #322 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Special Setting and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of K. Lee Marshall ) filed byRegus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC Relating to Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE (re #322 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Special Setting and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of K. Lee Marshall ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Redacted Version of Declaration of S. Chandler Visher, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, #4 Declaration Redacted Version of Declaration of S. Chandler Visher, #5 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, #6 Declaration Unredacted Version of Declaration of S. Chandler Visher)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #324 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 REPLY (re #311 MOTION to Exclude Witness Reports Under FRE 702 (and unredacted version of Exhibit A pursuant to ECF No. 309) ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aalaei In Support, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Aalaei, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Aalaei)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #322 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Special Setting and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of K. Lee Marshall filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Ramsdell, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 REPLY (re #283 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 Against Plaintiffs Circle Click Media LLC, and CTNY Insurance Group, LLC ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Special Setting and Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of K. Lee Marshall filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Responses due by 9/18/2015. Replies due by 9/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ERRATA Regarding #310 Opposition of Defendant Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus PLC and HQ Global Workplaces LLC to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 9/4/2015) Modified on 9/8/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ERRATA re #319 Declaration in Support, Notice of Errata Re Decl of Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Motion for Security for Costs; Defs' Opp to Plfs' Mtn to Exclude Expert Report of M. Vogel & J. Pampinella; Defs' Reply ISO MTD for Lack of Standing; and Counterclaim-Plaintiff Regus Management Group LLC's Reply ISO MSJ on Second Amended Counterclaim for Breach of Contract CTNY Ins Group, LLC by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of #316 Opposition/Response to Motion, #315 Reply to Opposition/Response, #318 Reply to Opposition/Response, #317 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #316 , #315 , #318 , #317 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REPLY (re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Second Amended Counterclaim against Counterclaim Defendant CTNY Insurance Group ) filed byRegus Management Group LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 REPLY (re #271 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 RESPONSE (re #311 MOTION to Exclude Witness Reports Under FRE 702 (and unredacted version of Exhibit A pursuant to ECF No. 309) ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 REPLY (re #273 MOTION for Bond /Security Costs ) Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Security for Costs filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 REPLY (re #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) ) Rev per Order Dkt 313 filed byCircle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 RESPONSE (re #283 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 Against Plaintiffs Circle Click Media LLC, and CTNY Insurance Group, LLC ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aalaei In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - G to the Aalaei Declaration)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MOTION to Exclude Witness Reports Under FRE 702 (and unredacted version of Exhibit A pursuant to ECF No. 309) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 8/28/2015. Replies due by 9/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell in Support of Motion to Exclude Witness Reports, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell, #3 Proposed Order)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Response re #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion to Certify Class byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/19/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #306 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND REPLY DECLARATION OF S. CHANDLER VISHER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foshee, Alyce) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion to Certify Class JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND REPLY DECLARATION OF S. CHANDLER VISHER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion to Certify Class, #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Reports Pursuant to FRE 702 (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/15/2015)
August 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Proposed Order re #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendants' Witness Reports Pursuant to FRE 702 by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/15/2015)
August 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Declaration of Craig P. Ramsdell in Support of #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DOCUMENTS RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESS REPORTS PURSUANT TO FRE 702 filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #301 ) (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/15/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of #299 Opposition/Response to Motion, #297 Reply to Opposition/Response, #295 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #299 , #297 , #295 ) (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 RESPONSE (re #273 MOTION for Bond /Security Costs ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Declaration of CTNY Insurance Group LLC in Support of #297 Reply to Opposition/Response, #295 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #297 , #295 ) (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY (re #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Second Amended Counterclaim against Counterclaim Defendant CTNY Insurance Group ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Declaration of Circle Click Media LLC in Support of #295 Opposition/Response to Motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #295 ) (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 RESPONSE (re #271 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Motion to Certify Class filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Reply, #4 Exhibit Unredacated Version of Reply, #5 Exhibit Redaction Version of Declaration, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Declaration)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY (re #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) ) (REDACTED VERSIONS OF REPLY BRIEF AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Reply)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Proposed Order re #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #282 Motion for leave to manually file video exhibit (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #284 Motion to Correct Docket No. 279-4 and file exhibits 3 and 4 to the Declaration of Lorraine Veber under seal. The clerk shall remove Docket No. 279-4 from the public record. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER re #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations filed by Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc, HQ Global Workplaces LLC. Defendants are ORDERED to refile their proposed order in compliance with Local Rule 79-5(d)(1)(B) within five (5) days of the signature date of this order. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/5/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #287 Stipulation To Extend Briefing Deadlines Related to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions under Rule 37 Against Plaintiffs.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #283 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 Against Plaintiffs Circle Click Media LLC, and CTNY Insurance Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/21/2015. Replies due by 9/4/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Briefing Deadlines Related to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions under Rule 37 Against Plaintiffs filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Ramsdell, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 EXHIBITS RE: ECF NO. 285 (cont'd.), Plaintiffs' Notice of Submission of Exhibits Pursuant to Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 8 to ECF No. 285 (Part 1 of 5), #2 Exhibit Ex. 8 to ECF No. 285 (Part 2 of 5), #3 Exhibit Ex. 8 to ECF No. 285 (Part 3 of 5), #4 Exhibit Ex. 8 to ECF No. 285 (Part 4 of 5), #5 Exhibit Ex. 8 to ECF No. 285 (Part 5 of 5), #6 Exhibit Ex. 9 to ECF No. 285 (Part 1 of 5), #7 Exhibit Ex. 9 to ECF No. 285 (Part 2 of 5), #8 Exhibit Ex. 9 to ECF No. 285 (Part 3 of 5), #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 to ECF No. 285 (Part 4 of 5), #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to ECF No. 285 (Part 5 of 5), #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 to ECF No. 285)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #278 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Revised Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class ("Motion"), #2 Exhibit 2, Ex. B to the Motion, #3 Exhibit 3, Ex. E to the Motion, #4 Exhibit 4, Ex. H to the Motion, #5 Exhibit 5, Ex. I to the Motion, #6 Exhibit 6, Ex. 27 to the Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei ISO Motion to Certify Class ("Aalaei Decl."), #7 Exhibit 7, Ex. 28 to the Aalaei Decl. (Part 1 of 2), #8 Exhibit 8, Ex. 28 to the Aalaei Decl. (Part 2 of 2))(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION To Correct Docket No. #279 -4 and File Under Seal Exhibits 3 and 4 to the Declaration of Lorraine Veber; Declaration of Tracy M. Talbot re #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 8/11/2015. Replies due by 8/18/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 7/28/2015) Modified on 7/29/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 37 Against Plaintiffs Circle Click Media LLC, and CTNY Insurance Group, LLC filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Talbot Decl, #2 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION to file video exhibit re #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 8/7/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Request for Judicial Notice re #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs 1-3, #2 Exhibit Exs 4-8, #3 Exhibit Exs 9-25, #4 Exhibit Exs 26-34, #5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #279 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Declaration of K. Lee Marshall in Support of #279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Spindler Dec, #2 Declaration Grant Dec, #3 Declaration Wall Dec, #4 Declaration Harris Dec, #5 Declaration Arbizu Dec, #6 Declaration Pelfrey Dec, #7 Declaration Zamansky Dec (Badri), #8 Declaration Zamansky Dec (LaPena), #9 Declaration Zamansky Dec (STG))(Related document(s) #279 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plfs' Class Certification Motion and Declarations filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: Redacted Opp to Plfs' Mtn for Class Cert, #2 Exhibit Ex. B: Unredacted Opp to Plfs' Mtn for Class Cert, #3 Exhibit Ex. C: Redacted Veber Decl, #4Sealed re #290 Order & Per Chambers Exhibit Ex. C-1: Redacted Veber Decl, #5 Exhibit Ex. C-2: Redacted Veber Decl, #6 Exhibit Ex. D: Unredacted Veber Decl, #7 Exhibit Ex. D-1: Unredacted Veber Decl, #8 Exhibit Ex. D-2: Unredacted Veber Decl, #9 Exhibit Ex. D-3: Unredacted Veber Decl, #10 Exhibit Ex. D-4: Unredacted Veber Decl, #11 Exhibit Ex. D-5: Unredacted Veber Decl, #12 Exhibit Ex. D-6: Unredacted Veber Decl, #13 Exhibit Ex. D-7: Unredacted Veber Decl, #14 Exhibit Ex. D-8: Unredacted Veber Decl, #15 Exhibit Ex. D-9: Unredacted Veber Decl, #16 Exhibit Ex. E: Redacted Butler Decl, #17 Exhibit Ex. F: Unredacted Butler Decl, #18 Exhibit Ex. G: Redacted Pampinella Decl, #19 Exhibit Ex. H: Unredacted Pampinella Decl, #20 Exhibit Ex. I: Redacted Vogel Decl, #21 Exhibit Ex. J: Unredacted Vogel Decl, #22 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/24/2015) Modified on 8/5/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Briefing Deadlines as to #273 MOTION for Bond /Security Costs, #272 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Second Amended Counterclaim against Counterclaim Defendant CTNY Insurance Group, #271 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. Responses due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/22/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #270 Motion Leave to exceed page limit. The page limit for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification shall be extended to thirty five (35) pages. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Briefing Deadlines Related to ECF Nos. 271-273 filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig Ramsdell, #2 Proposed Order)(Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 RESPONSE (re #270 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition to Planitiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of K. Lee Marshall ) filed byCircle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MOTION for Bond /Security Costs filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/30/2015. Replies due by 8/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Tracy Talbot, #2 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Second Amended Counterclaim against Counterclaim Defendant CTNY Insurance Group filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Regus Management Group LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Regus plc(a Jersey, Channel Islands, public limited company). Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/30/2015. Replies due by 8/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/30/2015. Replies due by 8/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nicole Hayes, #2 Declaration Eric Aponte, #3 Declaration K. Lee Marshall, #4 Proposed Order Motion to Dismiss)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Opposition to Planitiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Declaration of K. Lee Marshall filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Responses due by 7/28/2015. Replies due by 8/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #267 Stipulation Extending Deadline to File Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 RESPONSE (re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Carla Meyer, #2 Declaration Lorraine Veber, #3 Declaration Tim Regan)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig P Ramsdell (Ramsdell, Craig) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The motion hearing previously scheduled for Friday, 8/28/2015 has been rescheduled for Friday, 9/25/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINES RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Samuel Conti granting #262 Stipulation (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc for Court Reporter Kelly Polvi. (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version). Responses due by 7/24/2015. Replies due by 8/14/2015. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version), 220 Case Management Conference - Further,, Extending Briefing Deadlines Related to Motion for Class Certification filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Lee Marshall, #2 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Declaration of Becky Shook-Wotzka in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Declaration of Melissa Herman in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Declaration of Stefan Oglevee in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Declaration of Limisha Watkins in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Declaration of Arsalon Badri in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Declaration of Roxanne Jones in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Declaration of Mark Petersen in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Declaration of Michelle LaPena in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Declaration of Jenny Belotserkovsky in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Declaration of Raymond Fullerton in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Declaration of Anne A. Ward in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 EXHIBITS re #248 Declaration in Support,, of Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 35 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 37 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 39 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 40 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 41 to Aalaei Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 42 to Aalaei Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. 43 to Aalaei Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. 44 to Aalaei Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. 46 to Aalaei Decl.)(Related document(s) #248 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 18 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 19 to Aalaei Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 20 to Aalaei Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. 21 to Aalaei Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. 22 to Aalaei Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. 25 to Aalaei Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. 31 to Aalaei Decl.)(Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Declaration of S. Chandler Visher in Support of #238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #238 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 32 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 33 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 34 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 36 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 38 to Aalaei Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 45 to Aalaei Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. 47 to Aalaei Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. 48 to Aalaei Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. 49 to Aalaei Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. 50 Aalaei Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex. 51 Aalaei Decl.)(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 5) (Redacted), #2 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 5) (Redacted), #3 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 5) (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (4 of 5) (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (5 of 5) (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 5) (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 5) (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 5) (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (4 of 5) (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit Ex. 30 to Aalaei Decl. (5 of 5) (Unredacted))(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 5) (Redacted), #2 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 5) (Redacted), #3 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 5) (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (4 of 5) (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (5 of 5) (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 5) (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 5) (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 5) (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (4 of 5) (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit Ex. 29 to Aalaei Decl. (5 of 5) (Unredacted))(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 24 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 26 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 27 to Aalaei Decl. (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Ex. 27 to Aalaei Decl. (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 2) (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 2) (Redacted), #7 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 2) (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 2) Unredacted)(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit Ex. 14 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit Ex. 15 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 16 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 2), #6 Exhibit Ex. 17 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 2), #7 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 3), #8 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 3), #9 Exhibit Ex. 23 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 3))(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 3), #4 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 3), #5 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 3), #6 Exhibit Ex. 12 to Aalaei Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 3), #8 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 3), #9 Exhibit Ex. 13 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 3))(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 EXHIBITS re #239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Aalaei Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Aalaei Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Aalaei Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Aalaei Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Aalaei Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Aalaei Decl. (1 of 3), #7 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Aalaei Decl. (2 of 3), #8 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Aalaei Decl. (3 of 3))(Related document(s) #239 ) (Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Relating to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Re: Sealing of Documents, #3 Exhibit Redacted Motion to Certify Class, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Motion to Certify Class, #5 Exhibit Ex. A to Motion, #6 Exhibit Ex. B to Motion, #7 Exhibit Ex. C to Motion, #8 Exhibit Ex. E to Motion, #9 Exhibit Ex. G to Motion, #10 Exhibit Ex. H to Motion, #11 Exhibit Ex. I to Motion, #12 Exhibit Ex. N to Motion, #13 Exhibit Ex. O to Motion)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION to Certify Class (redacted version) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 6/15/2015. Replies due by 6/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit P, #8 Exhibit Q, #9 Proposed Order Granting Class Certification)(Visher, S.) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 10:27-11:08 held on 03/19/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Kelly Polvi, Telephone number 503.779.7406; email kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 10:27-11:08. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #235 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2015. (Related documents(s) #235 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 5/23/2015)
May 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 9:01-9:19 held on 09/11/2014, before Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Transcriber Kelly Polvi, Telephone number 503.779.7406; email kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 9:01-9:19. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #235 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2015. (Related documents(s) #235 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 5/23/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Foshee, Alyce) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyce Winn Foshee (Foshee, Alyce) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Chandler Visher (Visher, S.) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #231 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Darci F. Madden. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and (Proposed) Order for Darci Madden ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9461950.) filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/22/2015) Modified on 4/23/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Ahmed Holman (Ahmed, Sara) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Tracy Marie Talbot for Defendants Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, HQ Global Workplaces, LLC, and Regus plc (Talbot, Tracy) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/20/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 3/19/2015. Court to issue written order. (FTR Time 10:27-11:08) Plaintiff Attorney: Ali Aalaei. Defendant Attorneys: Lee Marshall; Sara Ahmed. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2015) Modified on 3/20/2015 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding RMG's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Letter Brief Regarding RMG's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit A through J to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Letter Brief Regarding RMG's Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Discovery Hearing set for 3/19/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/12/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Interrogatories to Defendants filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Interrogatories to Defendants, #2 Exhibit 1 through 8 to the Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #3 Exhibit 9 through 16 to the Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #4 Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #5 Exhibit A through H to the Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Letter Brief Joint Regarding Defendant RMG's Requests for Production of Documents, Set One filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant RMG's Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #3 Exhibit B through F to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewiz in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #4 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Plaintiffs' Portions of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus Management Group LLC's Request for Production of Documents, Set One, #5 Exhibit 1 through 9 to the Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Plaintiffs' Portions of Joint Letter)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Letter Brief Joint Regarding Interrogatories 10 and 13-16 of RMG's Interrogatories, Set One filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Interrogatories 10 and 13-16 of RMG's Interrogatories, Set One, #2 Exhibit A through D to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #3 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Plaintiffs' Portions of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Interrogatories 10 and 13-16 of RMG's Interrogatories, Set One, #4 Exhibit 1 through 4 to the Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of Joint Letter Brief)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Samuel Conti: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/5/2014. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 03/01/2015; Deadline to complete expert witness disclosures: 04/01/2015; Deadline to complete expert discovery: 05/01/2015; Deadline to file Motion for Class Certification: 06/01/2015. Parties shall meet and confer on a proposed briefing schedule for Motion for Class Certification. No discovery will be conducted on damages until after Class Certification. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney Ali Aalaei. Defendant Attorney Lee Marshall; Stephanie Blazewicz. This is a text only Minute Entry (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2014)
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 11/28/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 218 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #180 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing (Re: Dkt. No. 195) held on 9/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 9/11/2014). (FTR Recording #9:01-9:18) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing. The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Friday, 09/05/2014, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #209 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Submission of Revised Versions of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Joseph Allen Garofolo terminated. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/18/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC reflecting service of Civil Standing Order for the Honorable Samuel Conti (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE on August 21, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Discovery Hearing - Discovery Letter Brief, ECF No. 195 reset to 9/11/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Letter from Defendants re Request to Continue Hearing on Discovery Letter Brief (Dkt. NO. 206) . (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #195 Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63). Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2014 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE & [PROPOSED] ORDER of Change In Counsel by Joseph Allen Garofolo (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/13/2014) Modified on 8/14/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 CLERKS NOTICE: Setting Hearing as to #195 Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63). Discovery Letter Hearing set for 8/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014) Modified on 5/11/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF). This is a Text Only Entry
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Statement re #203 Order Joint Statement Pursuant to Order Re: Discovery Letter Brief by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of Joint Statement with its Ex. 1, #2 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Statement with its Ex. A)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 OBJECTIONS to re #202 Reply to Opposition/Response, Plaintiffs' Objection to Declaration of Jeanne Sherman in Support of Reply Brief Regarding Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 31, 2014. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 REPLY (re #180 MOTION to Dismiss ) Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz, #2 Declaration of David Mitchell Murphy, #3 Declaration of Sharon Edmondson, #4 Declaration of Jeanne Sherman)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #192 Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants To File Declaration.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63 (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Requests for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63 filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz, #2 Declaration of Nicole Hayes, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Declaration of Michelle Hargis in Support of #195 Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #195 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of #195 Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of #195 Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 (Sought to be Sealed), #9 Exhibit 9 (Sought to be Sealed), #10 Exhibit 10 (Sought to be Sealed), #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Discovery Letter Brief (Joint Letter Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Production Nos. 53-54, 56-57, 59-60, and 62-63) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Declaration of Michael Osburn in Support of #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Renewed MTD Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #187 ) (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Relating to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Renewed MTD Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #187 ) (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal To Extend Time For Defendants To File Declaration In Support filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephanie A. Blazewicz In Support Of Stipulation)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Declaration of Anne A. Ward in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #180 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/27/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to #180 Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/18/2014) Modified on 7/27/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Stipulation Regarding Regus Revenue, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Stipulation Regarding Regus Revenue, #7 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Garofolo Declaration ISO Opposition, #8 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Garofolo Declaration ISO Opposition, #9 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Garofolo Declaration ISO Opposition, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Garofolo Declaration ISO Opposition, #11 Exhibit Ex. A to Ward Declaration ISO Opposition, #12 Exhibit Ex. B to Ward Declaration ISO Opposition, #13 Exhibit Ex. C to Ward Declaration ISO Opposition)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER Enlarging Time to Respond and Reply. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #180 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/18/2014. Replies due by 7/28/2014. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 07/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of #183 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #180 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Enlarge Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Defendant Regus plc to File Its Reply Thereto filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #183 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #180 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Enlarge Time for Plaintiffs to File Their Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Defendant Regus plc to File Its Reply Thereto filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 CLERKS NOTICE Clarifying Briefing Schedule as to #180 MOTION to Dismiss scheduled for hearing on 09/05/2014, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/9/2014. Replies due by 7/16/2014. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declarations of Michael Osburn and Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Renewed MTD Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redacted Version of Exhibit A of the Declaration of Michael Osburn, #2 Exhibit B [Part 1] Unredacted Version of Exhibit B of the Declaration of Michael Osburn, #3 Exhibit B [Part 2] Unredacted Version of Exhibit B of the Declaration of Michael Osburn, #4 Exhibit C [Part 1] Redacted Version of Exhibit C of the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz, #5 Exhibit C [Part 2] Redacted Version of Exhibit C of the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz, #6 Exhibit D Unredacted Version of Exhibit D of the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz, #7 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Administrative MTN to File Under Seal Exhibits of Michael Osburn and Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Renewed MTD Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declarations of Michael Osburn and Stephanie A. Blazewicz ISO Renewed MTD Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 Renotice motion hearing Renewed Notice of Motion and #29 Motion to Dismiss Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tim Regan in Support of Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion to Dismiss Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/27/2014 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 6/24/2014 before Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 6/24/2014). (Recording #3:03 - 3:15.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CLERKS NOTICE: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 6/24/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for defense is directed to set-up the conference call and provide the Court with the access code. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
May 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ali Ari Aalaei (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 5/10/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc re #175 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Submission Of Revised Redacted Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 4-6)(Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS TO JOINT DISCOVERY LETTERS 1, 2, AND 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/1/2004. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ON JOINT LETTER BRIEFS 1 AND 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/16/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Letter from Ali A. Aalaei, Counsel for Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Letter from Stephanie A. Blazewicz, Counsel for Defendants, re [Proposed] Order After Hearing on Joint Letter Briefs Nos. 1 and 2 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Defendants' [Proposed] Order After Hearing on Joint Letter Briefs Nos. 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Order After Hearing on Joint Letter Briefs Nos. 1 and 2, #3 Exhibit C: A redline of Plaintiffs' proposed revisions to the proposed order, #4 Exhibit D: A letter summarizing Plaintiffs' proposed revisions regarding the proposed order)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF #3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/3/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ERRATA re #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING JOINT LETTER BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANT REGUS PLC'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Regus Management Group LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Regus plc(a Jersey, Channel Islands, public limited company). (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 3/27/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 3/27/2014). (FTR Recording 9:42-11:01; 11:25-11:51) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits D and E to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #163 ) (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CLERKS NOTICE Setting Discovery Hearing. TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL OF RECORD: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for March 27, 2014 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying #130 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Reconsideration of a Prior Order; denying #155 Motion to file Surreply (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 CLERKS NOTICE Vacating Hearing. The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Friday, 03/21/2014, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Letter Brief re #163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to the Delcaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order [redacted], #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order [redacted])(Related document(s) #163 ) (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order [redacted], #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order [redacted], #7 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #8 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #9 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #10 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order, #11 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order [unredacted], #12 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Joint Letter Brief Regarding Defendant Regus PLC's Motion for Protective Order [unredacted], #13 Proposed Order)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declarations ISO Joint Letter Brief Nos. 1 and 2 filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Regan Decl, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Ex A Garofolo Decl (Redacted -- 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit Ex A Garofolo Decl (Redacted -- 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit Ex B Garofolo Decl (Unredacted -- 1 of 3), #6 Exhibit Ex B Garofolo Decl (Unredacted -- 2 of 3), #7 Exhibit Ex B Garofolo Decl (Unredacted -- 3 of 3), #8 Exhibit Ex C Blazewicz Decl (Redacted), #9 Exhibit Ex D Blazewicz Decl (Unredacted 1 of 5), #10 Exhibit Ex D Blazewicz Decl (Unredacted 2 of 5), #11 Exhibit Ex D Blazewicz Decl (Unredacted 3 of 5), #12 Exhibit Ex D Blazewicz Decl (Unredacted 4 of 5), #13 Exhibit Ex D Blazewicz Decl (Unredacted 5 of 5))(Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Letter Brief #2) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Declaration of Michelle Hargis in Support of #159 Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Letter Brief #1) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Discovery Letter Brief(Joint Letter Brief #1) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #130 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Re-filed Publicly). Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 RESPONSE (re #155 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re #152 Reply to Opposition/Re ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 OBJECTIONS to re #154 Declaration in Support, #153 Declaration in Support, to Evidence in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to file Motion for Reconsideration by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Proposed Order re #155 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re #152 Reply to Opposition/Re by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re #152 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Responses due by 3/18/2014. Replies due by 3/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Administrative Motion for Leave to File Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Declaration of Becky Shook-Wotzka in Support of #152 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #152 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of #152 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #152 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 REPLY (re #130 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Re-filed Publicly) ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 OBJECTIONS to re #149 Declaration in Support, #150 Supplemental Brief, by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Supplemental Brief re #146 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Reply In Support Of Administrative Motion To Lodge Originals filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #146 ) (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Declaration of Nishant Kohli in Support of #133 Declaration in Support, Amended Declaration filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #133 ) (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Declaration of Ali A. Aalaei in Support of #147 Brief,, filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #147 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Brief re #146 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion to Lodge with the Court Originals of Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #146 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #141 Administrative Motion to Lodge with the Court Originals of Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #130 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Re-filed Publicly).(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of #142 Objection filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #142 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2014)
February 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OBJECTIONS to re #140 Opposition/Response to Motion,, by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/16/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION re #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bahareh Wullschleger in Support of Administrative Motion to Lodge with the Court Originals of Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Lodge with the Court Originals of Certain Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration)(Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE (re #137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie A. Blazewicz in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE (re #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint ) Statement of Nonopposition filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Declaration in Support of #137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #137 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying #124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc re #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Declaration of K. Lee Marshall in Support of #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Declaration of Nishant Kohli in Support of #132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to H)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Oppostition, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Hayes Dec, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Oppostition, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Hayes Declaration, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit A to Hayes Declaration - 1 of 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit A to Hayes Declaration - 2 of 2, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit B to Hayes Declaration)(Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 EXHIBITS re #130 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Re-filed Publicly) Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo (Doc. 123-1) (Re-filed Publicly) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Related document(s) #130 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (Re-filed Publicly) filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint (Re-filed Publicly))(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE (re #124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket #123 ) of Defendants Regus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus PLC, and HQ Global Workplaces LLC to Court Order Re: Motion to Seal filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER for supplemental briefing re #124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Correction of Docket #123 filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/28/2014. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 13, 2013, before Judge Samuel Conti. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2014. (Related documents(s) #126 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC re #123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proof of Service of Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and [PROPOSED] ORDER Correction of Docket #123 filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 1/20/2014) Modified on 1/21/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph A. Garofolo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Redacted Version of Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #5 Redacted Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #6 Unredacted Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit B)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 1/20/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ANSWER to #101 (Second Amended Counterclaim of Regus Management Group LLC) byCTNY Insurance Group LLC(a Connecticut limited liability company, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Circle Click Media LLC(a California limited liability company). (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #120 Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Plaintiffs to Move for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to Add Plaintiffs and for Defendants to File an Opposition Thereto.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Enlarge Time for Plaintiffs to Move for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to Add Plaintiffs and for Defendants to File an Opposition Thereto filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re: Amendment of Pleadings. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/13/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 12/13/2013 before Judge Samuel Conti. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball) (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #107 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CLERKS NOTICE Vacating Hearing. The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Friday, 11/22/2013, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY (re #107 MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim and Prayer for Attorney's Fees of Second Amended Counterclaims of Regus Management Group LLC ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC(a Connecticut limited liability company, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Circle Click Media LLC(a California limited liability company). (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #106 Stipulated Protective Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/04/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #109 Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Metro Talent LLC And Defendants.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE (re #107 MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim and Prayer for Attorney's Fees of Second Amended Counterclaims of Regus Management Group LLC ) Defendant Regus Management Group LLC's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Dismiss filed byRegus Management Group LLC(a Delaware limited liability company). (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Plaintiff Metro Talent LLC And Defendants filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brian Golden (Golden, David) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss First Counterclaim and Prayer for Attorney's Fees of Second Amended Counterclaims of Regus Management Group LLC filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC(a Connecticut limited liability company, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated), Circle Click Media LLC(a California limited liability company), Metro Talent, LLC(a California limited liability company). Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 10/31/2013. Replies due by 11/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY (re #98 MOTION for Protective Order ) Defendant Regus PLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Protective Order filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of regus PLC's Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of Regus PLC's Reply Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Supplemental Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of Regus PLC's Reply Brief, #4 Exhibit C to Supplemental Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz in Support of Regus PLC's Reply Brief)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Request for Judicial Notice re #102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #102 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo in Support of #102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #102 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE (re #98 MOTION for Protective Order ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Regus plc's Motion for Protective Order filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Amended COUNTERCLAIM Second Amended Counterclaims against All Plaintiffs. Filed byRegus Management Group LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus plc. (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Further Amend Regus Management Group, LLC's Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/02/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION re #93 Counterclaim Stipulation To Further Amend Regus Management Group, LLC's Counterclaims Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 15 (a)(2) filed by Regus Management Group LLC. (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION for Protective Order filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 10/8/2013. Replies due by 10/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominique Yates, #2 Declaration of Stephanie Blazewicz, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Proposed Order)(Blazewicz, Stephanie) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #96 Amended Motion for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Christopher J. Schmidt.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Amended MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Christopher J. Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8019741.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/20/2013 filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schmidt, Christopher) (Filed on 9/24/2013) Modified on 9/25/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #94 Motion for Attorney Christopher Schmidt to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Christopher J. Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8019741.) filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC(a Delaware limited liability company), Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schmidt, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2013) Modified on 9/23/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Amended COUNTERCLAIM First Amended Counterclaims of Regus Management Group LLC against All Plaintiffs. Filed byRegus Management Group LLC. (Wullschleger, Bahareh) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/10/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #80 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Regus Management Group, LLC., Regus Business Centre, LLC, Regus plc, and HQ Global Workplaces LLC; (Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #81 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part #82 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing. The Motion Hearings, which have been noticed for Friday, 08/09/2013, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearings are hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY (re #82 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY (re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Letter from Lee Marshall to Honorable Judge Samuel Conti. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #82 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byRegus Management Group LLC. (Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byRegus Management Group LLC. (Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Declaration of Anne A. Ward in Support of #82 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Related document(s) #82 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/15/2013. Replies due by 7/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 7/15/2013. Replies due by 7/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Enlarge Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims and to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/21/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #78 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Answer to Amended Complaint #65 Amended Complaint ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF REGUS MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC, REGUS BUSINESS CENTRE LLC, HQ GLOBAL WORKPLACES, LLC, AND REGUS PLC TO SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIM against CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC byRegus Management Group LLC, HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus plc, Regus Business Centre LLC. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part #69 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Lee Marshall BRYAN CAVE LLP'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bo Zeng (Zeng, Bo) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Allen Garofolo (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Reply ISO SRJN)(Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OBJECTIONS to re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice [69-1] by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 03/22/2013. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 5/11/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF). This is a Text Only Entry
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 3/18/2013. Replies due by 3/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental RJN, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A & B, #3 Proposed Order)(Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to 3/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/28/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Class Action Complaint) against All Defendants. Filed byCircle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC, CTNY Insurance Group LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CLERKS NOTICE: The Court has rescheduled the Case Management Conference scheduled for Friday, March 1, 2013 before the Honorable Samuel Conti. The conference has been reset for Friday, March 15, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Parties are to file one Joint Case Management Conference Statement seven days prior to the conference. Please report to Courtroom 1, on the 17th floor, U.S. Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #62 Stipulation extending Plaintiffs time to 2/11/13 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants response is due by 3/4/13. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extensions of Time Relating to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/11/13 is continued to 3/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Mostajelean, Bahareh) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying without prejudice #29 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part #31 motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting #57 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC filed by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Regus plc (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options HQ Global Workplaces LLC (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Regus Business Centre, LLC (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Regus Management Group, LLC (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Entities by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc identifying Corporate Parent Regus plc for HQ Global Workplaces LLC. HQ GLOBAL WORKPLACES, LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeng, Bo) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeng, Bo) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeng, Bo) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC re #24 Amended Complaint (Zeng, Bo) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Change In Counsel CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CLERKS NOTICE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Regus PLC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint set for hearing on November 16, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Samuel Conti is submitted for a decision on the pleadings. Parties are hereby informed that there will be no appearance (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY (re #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Rockey, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Rockey, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ERRATA re #40 Opposition/Response to Motion, #39 Opposition/Response to Motion by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re #40 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #40 ) (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/27/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT re #40 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Anne A. Ward with Exhibits A-B by CTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed byCTNY Insurance Group LLC, Circle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #28 Stipulation: The hearing for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint (Doc. 7) and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. 9) (collectively, "Motions") is vacated. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is due October 12, 2012. Plaintiffs need not file oppositions to Defendants' Motions on October 8, 2012, and need only file oppositions to any motions filed by Defendants in response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The hearing date for any motions filed by Defendants in response to the First Amended Complaint is set for November 16, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Proposed Order re #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Corrected Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Proposed Order re #29 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES CORRECTED PROPOSED ORDER by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Request for Judicial Notice re #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of JAIME BISHOP in Support of #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF JAIME BISHOP IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of JEROME GRANT in Support of #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF JEROME GRANT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Declaration of ERIC APONTE in Support of #31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF ERIC APONTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #31 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 10/26/2012. Replies due by 11/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Declaration of TIM REGAN in Support of #29 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATION OF TIM REGAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byHQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by HQ Global Workplaces LLC, Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Responses due by 10/26/2012. Replies due by 11/2/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) MOTIONS filed by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration K. Lee Marshall)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc identifying Corporate Parent Regus plc for Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. REGUS BUSINESS CENTER LLC AND REGUS PLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITITES OR PERSONS (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by CTNY Insurance Group LLC (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metro Talent, LLC (Aalaei, Ali) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to HQ Global Workplaces LLC. (hph, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Class Action Complaint) against All Defendants. Filed byCircle Click Media LLC, Metro Talent, LLC, CTNY Insurance Group LLC. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting #22 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motions and Extend Time for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to the Stipulation, and good cause appearing, the Court orders as follows: Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint no later than September 24, 2012. Any answer or other response by Defendants to a first amended complaint is due on October 15, 2012. Plaintiffs oppositions to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint (Doc. 7) and Defendants Motion to Dismiss Regus plc for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. 9) (collectively, Motions) are due on October 8, 2012. Defendants reply briefs in support of their Motions are due on October 22, 2012. The hearing date for the Motions is set for November 16, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor. A case management conference is set for January 11, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor. The parties shall file a joint case management statement at least seven days prior to the case management conference. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motions [and Extend Time for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint] filed by Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL FILING IN SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/11/2012) Modified on 9/12/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/7/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) Motions filed by Circle Click Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Garofolo)(Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Circle Click Media LLC (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Circle Click Media LLC.. (Garofolo, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by 9/10/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc re #11 Declaration in Support, #10 Declaration in Support, #12 Declaration in Support, #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Declaration of JAIME BISHOP in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION DECLARATION OF JAIME BISHOP IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byRegus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Declaration of TIM REGAN in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION DECLARATION OF TIM REGAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byRegus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Declaration of K. LEE MARSHALL in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION DECLARATION OF K. LEE MARSHALL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byRegus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS REGUS PLC FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/10/2012. Replies due by 9/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc re #7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/10/2012. Replies due by 9/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Regus Business Centre LLC, Regus Management Group LLC, Regus plc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regus Management Group LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 ADR Scheduling Order, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Declaration in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Regus Management Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Regis Corporation, Corporate Parent Regus Goup Limited for Regus Management Group LLC. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (far, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Michael Osburn in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byRegus Management Group LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (far, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-12-520600. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611076945). Filed byRegus Management Group LLC. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2012: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2015: #2 Receipt) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Circle Click Media LLC v. Regus Management Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Circle Click Media LLC
Represented By: Ali Ari Aalaei
Represented By: Bo Zeng
Represented By: Joseph Allen Garofolo
Represented By: Kelly Anne Weekes
Represented By: Alyce Winn Foshee
Represented By: Craig P Ramsdell
Represented By: S. Chandler Visher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metro Talent, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Allen Garofolo
Represented By: Ali Ari Aalaei
Represented By: Bo Zeng
Represented By: David Brian Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTNY Insurance Group LLC
Represented By: Joseph Allen Garofolo
Represented By: Ali Ari Aalaei
Represented By: Alyce Winn Foshee
Represented By: Bo Zeng
Represented By: Craig P Ramsdell
Represented By: S. Chandler Visher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regus Management Group LLC
Represented By: Bahareh Maryam Wullschleger
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Tracy Marie Talbot
Represented By: Christopher John Schmidt
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Marshall
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Blazewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regus Business Centre LLC
Represented By: Bahareh Maryam Wullschleger
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Tracy Marie Talbot
Represented By: Christopher John Schmidt
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Marshall
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Blazewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regus plc
Represented By: Bahareh Maryam Wullschleger
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Tracy Marie Talbot
Represented By: Christopher John Schmidt
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Marshall
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Blazewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HQ Global Workplaces LLC
Represented By: Bahareh Maryam Wullschleger
Represented By: Meryl Macklin
Represented By: Tracy Marie Talbot
Represented By: Christopher John Schmidt
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Rockey
Represented By: Darci F. Madden
Represented By: Kenneth Lee Marshall
Represented By: Sara Ahmed
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Blazewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?