Mills v. HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mills
Defendant: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., HSBC Card Services, Inc, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC Auto Finance and HSBC Consumer Lending (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04010
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Motion for Class Certification due by 11/8/2013. Responses due by 12/6/2013. Replies due by 1/3/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER DENYING re 53 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by HSBC Auto Finance, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Kenneth Mills, HSBC Consumer Lending (USA), Inc., Benjamin Wilkes, HSBC Card Services, Inc ;ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER. Lead trial counsel for both parties shall meet and confer in person in Courtroom G no later than June 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/18/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion for Class Certification due by 9/6/2013. Responses due by 10/4/2013. Replies due by 11/1/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/12 is continued to 1/11/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/4/12., Motions terminated: 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joi nt Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by HSBC Auto Finance, HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc., HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Kenneth Mills, HSBC Consumer Lending (USA), Inc., HSBC Card Services, Inc.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mills
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Santacana
Represented By: Daniel M. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Shannon E. Ponek
Represented By: Kristina A Del Vecchio
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Card Services, Inc
Represented By: Kristina A Del Vecchio
Represented By: Shannon E. Ponek
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kristina A Del Vecchio
Represented By: Shannon E. Ponek
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Auto Finance
Represented By: Kristina A Del Vecchio
Represented By: Shannon E. Ponek
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Consumer Lending (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Kristina A Del Vecchio
Represented By: Shannon E. Ponek
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?