Bostik, Inc. v. J.E. Higgins Lumber Company et al
Plaintiff: Bostik, Inc.
Defendant: J.E. Higgins Lumber Company and Golden State Flooring, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04021
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Bostik, Inc. against Defendant J.E. Higgins Lumber Company in the amount of $680,793.06. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/4/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 27 Motion for Default Judgment.Signed by by Judge Samuel Conti 1/10/2013. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CORRECTED ORDER WITH SIGNATURE by Judge Samuel Conti granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal of Action as to Defendant Golden State Flooring, Inc. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/12/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/27/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 8 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Defendant J. E. Higgins Lumber Company filed by Bostik, Inc... Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bostik, Inc. v. J.E. Higgins Lumber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bostik, Inc.
Represented By: Kristy K. Marino
Represented By: Frank W. Dicastri
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.E. Higgins Lumber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Deer
Represented By: Dortha Larene Pyles
Represented By: Rubin Marcel Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?