Rossell v. The Weather Channel, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Rossell
Defendant: The Weather Channel, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv04098
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request For an Order Granting a Stay and Proposed Order (Civ.L.R.6-2) filed by The Weather Channel, LLC, Michael Rossell, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossell v. The Weather Channel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rossell
Represented By: David Christopher Parisi
Represented By: Suzanne Havens Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weather Channel, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?