Krylova v. Genentech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Irina Krylova
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04120
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/14/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 03/12/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 34 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/11/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/27/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/2/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krylova v. Genentech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Krylova
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?