Rincon v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees

Plaintiff: Melanie Rincon
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Case Number: 3:2012cv04158
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 9 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
November 6, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 15 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
December 20, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/20/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
January 10, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/9/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Abigail V. Carter (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re W. Gary Kohlman (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
June 5, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order in Re Discovery and Dispositive Motion Dates. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
August 12, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 13, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rincon v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Rincon
Represented By: Richard Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: Andrew H. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.