Harrison Development, LLC et al v. Imbelloni Construction Co. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: 2051 Harrison Street Associates, LLC, Imbelloni Construction Co. Inc. and Harrison Development, LLC
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company and Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv04178
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/26/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 01/29/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 18 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/13/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/11/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison Development, LLC et al v. Imbelloni Construction Co. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2051 Harrison Street Associates, LLC
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Represented By: Dawn Abigail Silberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imbelloni Construction Co. Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Abigail Silberstein
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison Development, LLC
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Represented By: Dawn Abigail Silberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa Cho
Represented By: David A. Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa Cho
Represented By: David A. Tartaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?