Hurt v. All Sweepstakes Contests
Plaintiff: Tyrone Hurt
Defendant: All Sweepstakes Contests
Case Number: 3:2012cv04187
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: PRE-FILING REVIEW OF COMPLAINT (No. C 13misc80054) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: PRE-FILING REVIEW OF COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurt v. All Sweepstakes Contests
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Sweepstakes Contests
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?