Jiau v. Poole et al
Petitioner: Winifred Jiau
Respondent: Kaire Poole and Randy Tews
Case Number: 3:2012cv04193
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER 31 32 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DECLINING TO RELATE CASES 29 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION 16 17 21 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: This action is dismissed without prejudice to petitioner filing a new action after she exhausts her administrative remedies. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2013) Modified on 1/23/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiau v. Poole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kaire Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Tews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Winifred Jiau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?