McCormack et al v. Safeway Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary McCormack and Samantha Stabenchek
Defendant: Safeway Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04377
Filed: August 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Arizona (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack et al v. Safeway Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McCormack
Represented By: Joy Malby Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Stabenchek
Represented By: Joy Malby Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?