Crosthwaite et al v. Geo Grout, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy and Highway Committee and Operating Engineers Local Union No.3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Geo Grout, Inc. and Kenneth Arthur Tholin
Case Number: 3:2012cv04387
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 WRIT of Execution Issued (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 24, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 44 Motion vacate hearing; granting 20 Motion for Default Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. Geo Grout, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No.3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Blake Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Grout, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Arthur Tholin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?