APL CO. Pte., LTD., v. Export International Inc.
Plaintiff: American President Lines, Ltd. and APL CO. Pte., LTD.,
Defendant: Export International Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04459
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 for Dismissal of Complaint filed by American President Lines, Ltd., APL CO. Pte., LTD.,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [SECOND] For Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by American President Lines, Ltd., APL CO. Pte., LTD., Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 To Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by American President Lines, Ltd., APL CO. Pte., LTD.,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APL CO. Pte., LTD., v. Export International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American President Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Mark K. deLangis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APL CO. Pte., LTD.,
Represented By: Mark K. deLangis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Export International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?