Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. et al v. D&L Elite Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. and The Black & Decker Corporation
Defendant: D&L Elite Investments, LLC, Billy Deng and Weishen Luo
Case Number: 3:2012cv04516
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Responses due by 1/12/2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER TO FILE RESPONSE RE: OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION re 203 Objection, filed by Yanjuan Luo. Responses due by 12/18/2015. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION RELEASING THE ASSET RESTRAINING ORDER re 200 Ex Parte Application re 50 Order to Show Cause Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Order Releasing the Asset Restraining Order Re Defendant Accounts at Bank of America filed by The Black & Decker Corporation, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. Objections due 11/23/2015. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor Weishen Luo (and additional names stated in 187 Order Granting PI.'s Application for Names to be Added to Writ of Execution; as to Judgment Debtor D&L Elite Investments, LLC, dba G Bay International ; as to Judgment Debtor Billy Deng all in the amount of$1,922,849.85. (Santa Clara) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR NAMES TO BE ADDED TO WRIT OF EXECUTION re 186 Affidavit, filed by The Black & Decker Corporation, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on March 6, 2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti finding as moot 174 Ex Parte Application ; granting 178 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on July 28, 2014. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER. Counsel may appear telephonically at the Motion Hearing on June 5, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. See Order for additional details. Signed by MagistrateJudge Laurel Beeler on 4/28/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/16/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/9/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Scheduling Order. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 9/29/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/28/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/16/2013.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/11/2013. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 95 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiffs is required to E-FILE the amended document.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 79 Motion for Relief from Asset Restraining Order.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING Contempt Sanctions re 58 Ex Parte Application for and Order to Show Cause Re: Comtempt Sanctions filed by The Black & Decker Corporation, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., 50 Order to Show Cause, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/19/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 70 Stipulation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing on Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 6/21/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/19/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 05/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SEIZURE ORDER, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/31/2013 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2013. The hearing on 04/24/2013 was under seal. Pursuant to the Court's direction, this order is made public as of May 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/24/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER UNSEALING COURT RECORDS. Signed by Senior Judge Samuel Conti on 12/10/12. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. et al v. D&L Elite Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Yana Bussin
Represented By: David K. Caplan
Represented By: Anthony Michael Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Black & Decker Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Yana Bussin
Represented By: David K. Caplan
Represented By: Anthony Michael Keats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&L Elite Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Deng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weishen Luo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?