Lyons v. Rebiejo et al
Plaintiff: Renee Charlene Lyons
Defendant: Steve Sweeney, Traci Rebiejo and Utpadel
Case Number: 3:2012cv04580
Filed: August 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/13. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE AND REFERRAL TO AN ALTERNATIVE MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/25/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING re 16 Stipulation oF Dismisssal Without Prejudice as to Officer Utpadel, only, filed by Traci Rebiejo. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/21/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Settlement Conference set for 2/22/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/17/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Rebiejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Rebiejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utpadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Charlene Lyons
Represented By: Alexander John Petale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?