Minden Pictures, Inc. v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc.
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04601
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 123 Stipulation filed by Minden Pictures, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/9/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 84 Defendant's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR WILEY TO FILE MOTIONS FOR FEES & BILL OF COSTS filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 62 Defenadnt's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC. Status Report due by 2/27/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESETTING CMC re 54 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Minden Pictures, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) Modified on 6/28/2013 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 31 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Second ORDER re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (MSJ)pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/13. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Re Notice Re Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 Stipulation for Protective Order filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minden Pictures, Inc. v. John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Crockett
Represented By: Alexander Rice Kerr
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiley & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Zansberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?