AO Ventures, LLC v. Gutierrez et al
Plaintiff: AO Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Armando Gutierrez, Jr. and CEA Global Education
Case Number: 3:2012cv04625
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMIS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 18, 2012. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING re 25 Letter filed by AO Ventures, LLC for Eric Puritsky to appear by phone on 12/21/12 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/9/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/9/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/25/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AO Ventures, LLC v. Gutierrez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Gutierrez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEA Global Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AO Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Gary J. Gorham
Represented By: Eric Ashton Puritsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?