Federal Trade Commission v. Springtech 77376, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Springtech 77376, LLC, Cedarcide Industries, Inc., Chemical Free Solutions LLC, Cedar Oil Technologies Corp. and Dave Glassel
Case Number: 3:2012cv04631
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFENDANT GLASSEL'S REPRESENTATION Show Cause Response due by 3/16/2018.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/23/2018. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 75 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to SPRINGTECH 77376, LLC, CEDARCIDE INDUSTRIES, INC., AND CEDAR OIL TECHNOLOGIES CORP. filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/25/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/26/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 70 Proposed Order filed by Federal Trade Commission. Motion due by 8/19/2013. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/18/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING re 60 Notice (Other) filed by Dave Glassel to change time of the settlement conference. Settlement Conference re-set for 4/16/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/11/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 37 First MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Federal Trade Commission; ORDER Denying 30 First MOTION to Change Venue filed by Dave Glassel. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/21/2013. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/8/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/10/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING re 14 SECOND Stipulation filed by Federal Trade Commission for Dft Dave Glassel to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/28/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING re 9 Stipulation To Extend Time for Deft Dave Glassel to Answe or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/15/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Springtech 77376, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Linda Katherine Badger
Represented By: Kerry O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springtech 77376, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedarcide Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemical Free Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Oil Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Glassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?