G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Castro et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Heloisa Castro, Claudio Almeida Waqued and Marcello's Pizza
Case Number: 3:2012cv04649
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE HEARING DATE (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FILING DEADLINE FOR CONCURRENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTIONS HEARING (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING FILING DEADLINE FOR CONCURRENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTIONS HEARING (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heloisa Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio Almeida Waqued
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcello's Pizza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?