Alvarez-Orellana v. City of Antioch et al
Plaintiff: Luis A. Alvarez-Orellana
Defendant: City of Antioch, Loren Bledsoe, Allan Cantando, David O. Livingston, Leroy D. Baca, L. Walker, C. Nedar and Los Angeles Superior Court, Clerk's Office
Case Number: 3:2012cv04693
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RESETTING CMC re 77 Notice (Other) filed by Luis A. Alvarez-Orellana Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Deadline. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/06/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 51 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Loren Bledsoe, Allan Cantando, City of Antioch Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on filing Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Reply thereto, filed by Luis A. Alvarez-Orellana., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on fili ng Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Reply thereto,, 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 6/17/2013. Replies due by 6/24/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Leroy D. Baca. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 Setting Date for Defendants City of Antioch, Loren Bledsoe and Allan Cantando to Answer the First Amended Complaint filed by Loren Bledsoe, Allan Cantando, City of Antioch. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 Continuing 4.18.13 CMC and Related Rule 26 Disclosures filed by Loren Bledsoe, Allan Cantando, City of Antioch Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT CLERK'S OFFICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 2/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE. Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/23/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference Pending Appearance of All Named Defendants and Decision on Motion To Dismiss filed by Loren Bledsoe, Allan Ca ntando, City of Antioch. Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 14, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Luis A. Alvarez-Orellana. 7 MOTION to Dismiss responses due by 1/3/2013. Replies due by 1/10/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Sa n Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2012. Replies to 7 MOTION to Dismiss due by 12/17/2012. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on December 5, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez-Orellana v. City of Antioch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Alvarez-Orellana
Represented By: Enrique Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Antioch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Cantando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy D. Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Nedar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Superior Court, Clerk's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?