PSI Seminars v. LB Seminars for Life Success and Leadership et al
Plaintiff: PSI Seminars
Defendant: LB Seminars for Life Success and Leadership, 0760438 B.C., Ltd., Bilhar Singh Dosanjh and Littley Hallate-Dosanjh
Case Number: 3:2012cv04711
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and any hearings scheduled in this matter are VACATED. It is further ordered that if any party certifies to this Court, with proper notice to opposing counsel on or befor e September 2, 2014, that the settlement terms have not been satisfied, this order shall be vacated and this cause shall be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/13/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. The Court GRANTS the parties' request and AMENDS the deadline to complete mediation from October 2, 2013 to November 30, 2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney Robert T. Fries For Shawn A. Mangano by PSI Seminars. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/13 is continued to 10/4/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/13 is continued to 6/14/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/26/13, Motions terminated: 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 28 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings,, CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Littley Hallate-Dosanjh.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS 14 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL JANUARY 25, 2013 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PSI Seminars v. LB Seminars for Life Success and Leadership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PSI Seminars
Represented By: Jesse Burl Chrisp
Represented By: Shawn Anthony Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LB Seminars for Life Success and Leadership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0760438 B.C., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilhar Singh Dosanjh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Littley Hallate-Dosanjh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?