Patel, DDS v. American Economy Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Namrata C. Patel, DDS
Defendant: Safeco Insurance company of America, American Economy Insurance Company and Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv04719
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/01/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/0/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Complete Depositions Noticed Prior to the Current Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off Date and to Amend Case Management Order as to Dates for Expert Disclosures. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/30/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel, DDS v. American Economy Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance company of America
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Pamela E. Cogan
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Namrata C. Patel, DDS
Represented By: Marcus Daniel Merchasin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?