Sidibe v. Sutter Health

Plaintiff: Djeneba Sidibe
Defendant: Sutter Health
Case Number: 3:2012cv04854
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER re 673 Order re Motion for Summary Judgment.The court issues this redacted version of its April 12, 2019 order granting summary judgment with respect to the Davis HSA candidate Tying Market and otherwise denying Sutter's motio n for summary judgment, denying in part and denying as moot in part Sutter's motion to exclude Dr. Chipty, and denying as moot the plaintiffs' motion to exclude Dr. Gowrisankaran. (This version also makes one non-substantive change to fix a typo in the last sentence of the order.) Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying without prejudice 392 Motion to Quash; terminating 401 Stipulation. As set forth in the attached order, the court denies the motion without prejudice and orders the parties to comply with the disp ute procedures in the undersigned's standing order. The parties should first meet and confer and, if they are unable to resolve their dispute, may submit a joint letter brief, in accordance with the court's standing order. (For clarificatio n, for the purposes of third-party subpoenas and discovery disputes, the court's standing order's instructions to "parties" is meant to refer to the participants in a third-party discovery dispute, even if they are not formal parties to the underlying litigation.) The parties' stipulation regarding a briefing schedule for the motion to quash is terminated as moot. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Discovery Order adjudicating privilege disputes re 216 , 217 , 225 , 226 , 229 . As set forth in the attached order, the court has reviewed the documents that Sutter Health has submitted in camera and finds that some of them are covered by t he attorney-client privilege and/or protected from disclosure under the work-product doctrine, and that some of them are not. The court orders Sutter to produce the non-privileged/protected documents or portions thereof to the plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on February 7, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING SUTTER HEALTH'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting 70 Motion to Dismiss. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 40 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Amended Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 15 Motion to Dismiss and amending 34 (signature line only). Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/3/2013. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 15 Motion to Dismiss.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sidibe v. Sutter Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Djeneba Sidibe
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Health
Represented By: Lin Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?