Nia v. Hedgpeth
Plaintiff: Aasim Nia
Defendant: A. Hedgpeth
Case Number: 3:2012cv04858
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (7 month conditional). Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 4/2/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER, Motions terminated: 57 MOTION to Vacate Trial Date or Alternatively to Continue Trial Date filed by Aasim Nia. Status Conference set for 4/8/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/10/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, Motions terminated: 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Clerk's Notice, Continuing Case Management Conference filed by R. T.C. Grounds, Kathleen Dickenson, A. Hedgpeth, D. Asuncion. Initial Case Management Conference set for11/12/14 is continued to 12/8/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/10/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 44 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT DICKERSON (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL 11 12 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nia v. Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aasim Nia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?