Sit et al v. Genentech, Inc. Tax Reduction Investment Plan et al
Plaintiff: Kinfong Sit and Mee Wai Chiu
Defendant: Ayumi Nakamoto and Genentech, Inc. Tax Reduction Investment Plan
Case Number: 3:2012cv04864
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting stipulation to dismiss entire case. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/17/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND; STAYING PROCEEDINGS IN PART; VACATING EXISTING DATES 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER CONTINUING REMAND HEARING; VACATING EXISTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS 62 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE: FURTHER BRIEFING ON MOTION TO REMAND (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions. Defendants Opposition due by November 13,2012; and Plaintiffs Reply due by November 20,2012. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/31/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/27/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sit et al v. Genentech, Inc. Tax Reduction Investment Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayumi Nakamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genentech, Inc. Tax Reduction Investment Plan
Represented By: Nicole A. Diller
Represented By: Alison Bowman Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinfong Sit
Represented By: Barry Howard Sacks
Represented By: Wendell H. Goddard
Represented By: Robert Yin Pong Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mee Wai Chiu
Represented By: Robert Yin Pong Chan
Represented By: Wendell H. Goddard
Represented By: Barry Howard Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?