Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Pathways Personnel Agency, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Pathways Personnel Agency, Inc. and Donna Wainwright
Case Number: 3:2012cv04876
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/7/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT BY NOV. 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/4/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/15/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 28 Motion to Dismiss (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PATHWAYS PERSONNEL AGENCY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 10 . An amended complaint is due December 21, 2012 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/5/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Pathways Personnel Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Schmaeling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathways Personnel Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Riso
Represented By: Andrew Paul Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Wainwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?