Cabrera et al v. Alvarez et al
Plaintiff: Lorena Cabrera, Dionisio Cabrera and Uriel Cabrera
Defendant: Henry Alvarez, III, San Francisco Housing Authority and Philip Tam
Case Number: 3:2012cv04890
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Judge Illston's standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 41 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 26 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/13 is continued to 3/29/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Uriel Cabrera) by Hon. Susan Illston granting 5 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem..(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabrera et al v. Alvarez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Cabrera
Represented By: Madeline Sargent Howard
Represented By: Jia Min Cheng
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionisio Cabrera
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Represented By: Jia Min Cheng
Represented By: Madeline Sargent Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uriel Cabrera
Represented By: Robert P. Capistrano
Represented By: Jia Min Cheng
Represented By: Madeline Sargent Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Alvarez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Tam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?