United States of America et al v. Benson

Petitioner: United States of America and Bill Ryder
Respondent: Burton O. Benson
Case Number: 3:2012cv04892
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 8, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by United States of America. Initial Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing reset for 12/20/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/06. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 4, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/4/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
September 24, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/9/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/24/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 19, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2012 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bill Ryder
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burton O. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?