Trustees of the IBEW/NECA Sound and Communications Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Pacific Signaling Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the IBEW/NECA Sound and Communications Health and Welfare Trust, IBEW Ninth District Pension Trust, Northern California Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Northern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust and the National Electrical Benefit Trust, Doug Lung and Gerald Pfeiffer
Defendant: Pacific Signaling Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04925
Filed: September 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING ATTENDANCE BY TELEPHONE by Judge William Alsup [denying 19 Motion to Appear by Telephone]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 15 Clerks Notice, 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Northern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust and the National Electrical Benefit Trust, Northern California Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust, Doug Lung, IBEW Ninth District Pension Trust, Trustees of the IBEW/NECA Sound and Communications Health and Welfare Trust, Gerald Pfeiffer]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/10/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the IBEW/NECA Sound and Communications Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Pacific Signaling Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the IBEW/NECA Sound and Communications Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Ninth District Pension Trust
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Joint Apprenticeship and Training Trust
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust and the National Electrical Benefit Trust
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Lung
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Pfeiffer
Represented By: Richard K. Grosboll
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Represented By: Chloe Isabelle Quail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Signaling Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Mark Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?