Brooks v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Cynthia Brooks
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04935
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING FINAL JUDGMENT 75 filed by Cynthia Brooks, Jacob Swoyer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FILING OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTION filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (REVISED) REGARDING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (REVISED) RE GARDING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE, 37 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Rep lies due by 2/27/2014. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion for preliminary approval hearing set for 2/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion due: 12/12/13. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike, 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING STAY filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. Replies due by 11/21/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17t h Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Filing of First Amended Complaint filed by Cynthia Brooks. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 filing of CMC Statement filed by U.S. Bank, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 13 RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/27/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Joan B. Tucker Fife
Represented By: Emilie Consuelo Woodhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Brooks
Represented By: Patricia Mary Kelly
Represented By: Eve Hedy Cervantez
Represented By: Harvey Sohnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?