Pi-Net International, Inc. v. First National Bank of Northern California
Plaintiff: Pi-Net International, Inc.
Defendant: First National Bank of Northern California
Case Number: 3:2012cv04957
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/7/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING re 35 Letter filed by First National Bank of Northern California for Wes Hunt to appear by phone on 5/10/13 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/6/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO EXCHANGE INITIAL DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/4/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING re 13 Stipulation To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by First National Bank of Northern California. Dft's response due by 1/28/13. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/4/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING re 13 Stipulation filed by First National Bank of Northern California To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/2/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/7/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pi-Net International, Inc. v. First National Bank of Northern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pi-Net International, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph S Farzam
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini
Represented By: Kristen-Leigh Myles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Northern California
Represented By: Kyle M. Fisher
Represented By: John Norman MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?