France Telecom S.A. v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Plaintiff: France Telecom S.A.
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv04967
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT MARVELL SEMICONDUCTOR'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 377 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER Granting 395 Stipulation to continue hearing as to 377 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing continued to 6/17/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/26/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 351 MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; GRANTING 292 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/02/2015. France Telecom's 351 motion to seal is GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 189 , 196 , 200 , 218 , 240 , 252 , 261 , 273 , 278 , 283 , 297 , 301 , and 304 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal; granting 309 motion styled as "Brief;" and denying as moot 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and 226 joinder of AT&T. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 312 VERDICT FORM (wholc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF RULE 408 DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF FRANCE TELECOM NON-3G LICENSES re 250 Brief and 252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal MOTION TO EXCLUDE FRANCE TELECOM'S '747 LICENSES FOR NON-3G PRODUCTS filed by Marvell Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/16/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/15/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Regarding Tentative Verdict Form re 181 Proposed Form of Verdict filed by France Telecom S.A., 182 Proposed Form of Verdict filed by Marvell Semiconductor Inc. (wholc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 FINAL RULING ON PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANT'S DAUBERT MOTION by Judge William H. Orrick re 184 Motion in Limine, 187 Motion in Limine, and 190 Motion in Limine. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 TENTATIVE RULING ON PARTIES' MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANT'S DAUBERT MOTION re 190 MOTION in Limine, 184 MOTION in Limine, and 187 MOTION in Limine. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/26/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/09/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT: France Telecom's request to file a supplemental expert infringement report of Professor Mitzenmacher is DENIED. The parties' motions to file under seal (Dkt. Nos. 164 , 167 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/12/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER ON MARVELL'S 137 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PUBLIC VERSION - REDACTED OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION) by Hon. William H. Orrick. Marvell's motion for summary judgment to invalidate Claims 1 and 10 of the '747 Patent is DENIED and its motion for partial summary judgment to preclude damages based on MAPL's sale of accused chips abroad is GRANTED. (An unredacted version of the order will be docketed under restriction limiting access to the case participants.)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/12/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE granting 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/10/2014. (This Order replaces 127 Order - which attached an incorrect image.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 104 Motion to Strike. The Court finds this matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument and hereby vacates the hearing currently scheduled for September 11, 2013. The Court DENIES Marvell's 104 MOTION to Strike but GRANTS Marvell leave to file a surreply brief and accompanying declaration, to be filed within 14 days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF LICENSES AND ASSOCIATED DOCUMENTS 108 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 99 LETTER OF REQUEST filed by Marvell Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/12/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re 82 Discovery Letter Brief. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 70 Discovery Letter Brief re: sufficiency of France Telecom's infringement contentions. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REQUESTING PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 69 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Marvell Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/16/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER REQUESTING PATENT DISCLOSURES re 70 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Marvell Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/12/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING DABNEY PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING AND DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup terminating 58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; terminating 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION re 55 Proposed Order filed by France Telecom S.A. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING AND DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS by Judge Alsup denying 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 41 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/26/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: France Telecom S.A. v. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: France Telecom S.A.
Represented By: James W. Dabney
Represented By: Henry Charles Lebowitz
Represented By: Joseph J. LoBue
Represented By: Elliot E. Polebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor Inc.
Represented By: Edward John DeFranco
Represented By: Eric Huang
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Raymond N. Nimrod
Represented By: Krista M. Rycroft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?