De Sausa et al v. HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Fernando De Sausa and Jessica Shum
Defendant: HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A., HSBC USA, Inc. and HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv05081
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/20/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 26 Stipulation for in camera review of settlement agreements. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/21/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference Pending Private Mediation. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings and to Continue The Initial Case Management Conference Hearing re 18 : Case Management Statement due by 8/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Sausa et al v. HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando De Sausa
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Shum
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Represented By: Richard C. J. Wahng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?