Cardoso v. County of San Mateo et al
Plaintiff: Monica M. Cardoso
Defendant: County of San Mateo, San Mateo County Sheriff's Office and Greg Munks
Case Number: 3:2012cv05130
Filed: October 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/15/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Denying Defendants' Request to be Excused from Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 05/09/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 29 Order Setting Settlement Conference ST filed by Monica M. Cardoso. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2013 08:30 AM in C ourtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Order referring parties to mediation and the notification from Court's ADR Unit confirming the appointment of Gregory D. Walker, Esq. to mediate the matter be recinded. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/21/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardoso v. County of San Mateo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica M. Cardoso
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?